DAVIS FITNESS STUDIO ONE LLC v. ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: DAVIS FITNESS STUDIO ONE LLC d/b/a CLUB PILATES MARLBORO, Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, DMWCP2, LLC d/b/a CLUB PILATES SOYSSET-WOODBURY and DAVID WOLK d/b/a DMWCP, LLC
Defendant: ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv10812
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVIS FITNESS STUDIO ONE LLC, DMWCP2, LLC, DAVID WOLK. ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (PURCARO, KELLY)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Summons to be Issued by DAVIS FITNESS STUDIO ONE LLC, DMWCP2, LLC, DAVID WOLK as to ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY. (PURCARO, KELLY)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by DAVIS FITNESS STUDIO ONE LLC, DMWCP2, LLC, DAVID WOLK.(PURCARO, KELLY)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by EVAN MATTHEW GOLDMAN on behalf of DAVIS FITNESS STUDIO ONE LLC (GOLDMAN, EVAN)
August 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by DAVIS FITNESS STUDIO ONE LLC as to ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY. (PURCARO, KELLY)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11230749) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DAVIS FITNESS STUDIO ONE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PURCARO, KELLY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS FITNESS STUDIO ONE LLC v. ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVIS FITNESS STUDIO ONE LLC d/b/a CLUB PILATES MARLBORO, Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: EVAN MATTHEW GOLDMAN
Represented By: KELLY MAGNUS PURCARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DMWCP2, LLC d/b/a CLUB PILATES SOYSSET-WOODBURY
Represented By: KELLY MAGNUS PURCARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID WOLK d/b/a DMWCP, LLC
Represented By: KELLY MAGNUS PURCARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?