D'ANJOU v. PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff: Francois D'Anjou
Defendant: PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10871
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 11/12/2020 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C, if conditions permit, before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/10/2020. (kd)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDONNELL, JAMES)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from James M. McDonnell replacing Notice of Filing #1 with Notice and Petition for Removal and Exhibit. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sm)
August 21, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/9/2020. (qa, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LUKE P. BRESLIN on behalf of PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC. (BRESLIN, LUKE)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from James M. McDonnell re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Petition for Removal)(MCDONNELL, JAMES)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant.. (MCDONNELL, JAMES)
August 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC.. (MCDONNELL, JAMES)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, case number BER L 4172 20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number BNJDC-11232757), filed by PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC.. (AttachNOTICE OF REMOVAL by PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, case number BER L 4172 20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number BNJDC-11232757), filed by PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Compliance, #2 Certification Certification of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond)(MCDONNELL, JAMES) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/24/2020) (ments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Compliance, #2 Certification Certification of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond)(MCDONNELL, JAMES) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/24/2020) (sm, ).sm, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #4 Notice of Filing, #5 Exhibit A) (sm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'ANJOU v. PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC.
Represented By: JAMES M. MCDONNELL
Represented By: LUKE P. BRESLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francois D'Anjou
Represented By: COLIN M. PAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?