KHAN v. DAVIS
Petitioner: KHALID KHAN
Respondent: BRUCE DAVIS
Case Number: 2:2020cv11210
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Letter request from DAG to be removed from noticing.. (HENDERSON, CAROL)
August 24, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Stay. Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to File and Stay Habeas Corpus Petition Pending Resolution of the second Petition for the Post Conviction relief that was submitted to the PCR Court on Feb 13, 2020. by KHALID KHAN. (bt, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number NEW043279.), filed by KHALID KHAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt, #3 Envelope)(bt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KHAN v. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KHALID KHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BRUCE DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?