TUNICK v. BROWN et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD TUNICK
Defendant: AMY E. HOOD, MICHAEL L. ESKEW, DAVID B. DILLON, PATRICIA A. WOERTZ, MUHTAR KENT, MICHAEL ROMAN, THOMAS K. BROWN, DAMBISA F. MOYO, IPPO VROHIDIS, GREGORY R. PAGE, TERI REINSETH, INGE G. THULIN, NICHOLAS C. GANGESTAD, HERBERT L HENKEL, PAMELA CRAIG and 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv11441
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. 3M COMPANY waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. THOMAS K. BROWN waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. TERI REINSETH waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. PATRICIA A. WOERTZ waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. PAMELA CRAIG waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. NICHOLAS C. GANGESTAD waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. MUHTAR KENT waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. MICHAEL ROMAN waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. MICHAEL L. ESKEW waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. IPPO VROHIDIS waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. INGE G. THULIN waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. HERBERT L HENKEL waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. GREGORY R. PAGE waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. DAVID B. DILLON waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. DAMBISA F. MOYO waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD TUNICK. AMY E. HOOD waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Redacted Public Version of Complaint by RICHARD TUNICK. (JACOBSEN, SCOTT)
August 26, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Seal. Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to THOMAS K. BROWN, PAMELA CRAIG, DAVID B. DILLON, MICHAEL L. ESKEW, NICHOLAS C. GANGESTAD, HERBERT L HENKEL, AMY E. HOOD, MUHTAR KENT, DAMBISA F. MOYO, GREGORY R. PAGE, TERI REINSETH, MICHAEL ROMAN, INGE G. THULIN, IPPO VROHIDIS, PATRICIA A. WOERTZ. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Verified Derivative Complaint by RICHARD TUNICK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(sm)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THOMAS K. BROWN, PAMELA CRAIG, DAVID B. DILLON, MICHAEL L. ESKEW, NICHOLAS C. GANGESTAD, HERBERT L HENKEL, AMY E. HOOD, MUHTAR KENT, DAMBISA F. MOYO, GREGORY R. PAGE, TERI REINSETH, MICHAEL ROMAN, INGE G. THULIN, IPPO VROHIDIS, PATRICIA A. WOERTZ ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW043277) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RICHARD TUNICK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Declaration, #4 Summons, #5 Envelope)(sm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TUNICK v. BROWN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY E. HOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL L. ESKEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID B. DILLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA A. WOERTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUHTAR KENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL ROMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS K. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAMBISA F. MOYO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPPO VROHIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY R. PAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERI REINSETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGE G. THULIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS C. GANGESTAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERBERT L HENKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAMELA CRAIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD TUNICK
Represented By: SCOTT RICHARD JACOBSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?