AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY v. HOSE ASSEMBLIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant: WINZELER STAMPING CO., HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. doing business as GE APPLIANCES and HOSE ASSEMBLIES, INC.
Cross Defendant: HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv11875
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Crossclaim by HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC..(HECK, ANDREW)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against HOSE ASSEMBLIES, INC., WINZELER STAMPING CO. by HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC..(HECK, ANDREW)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC., HOSE ASSEMBLIES, INC. by WINZELER STAMPING CO.. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Cover Letter)(WEATHERSTON, JAY)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGG TATARKA on behalf of HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. (TATARKA, GREGG)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk for all further proceedings. Judge Stanley R. Chesler, Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/4/20. (ak, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (jr)
August 31, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Jury Demand, Party Information. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jc, )
August 31, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/18/2020. (jc, )
August 31, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. doing business as GE APPLIANCES. Attorney ANDREW JAMES HECK for HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. doing business as GE APPLIANCES added. (HECK, ANDREW)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. doing business as GE APPLIANCES. (HECK, ANDREW)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. doing business as GE APPLIANCES from Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, case number BER-L-4156-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11279390), filed by HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. doing business as GE APPLIANCES.(HECK, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY v. HOSE ASSEMBLIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINZELER STAMPING CO.
Represented By: JAY TUCKER WEATHERSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. doing business as GE APPLIANCES
Represented By: ANDREW JAMES HECK
Represented By: GREGG TATARKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSE ASSEMBLIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: ANDREW JAMES HECK
Represented By: GREGG TATARKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?