ATLANTIC NEUROSURGICAL SPECIALISTS P.A. et al v. UNITED HEALTHCARE GROUP INC. et al
Plaintiff: ATLANTIC NEUROSURGICAL SPECIALISTS P.A. and AMERICAN SURGICAL ARTS, P.C.
Defendant: OXFORD HEALTH PLANS LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC and UNITED HEALTHCARE GROUP INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv13834
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss and Staying Discovery. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/19/2020. (ams, )
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS X. MANNING on behalf of OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE GROUP INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from Francis X. Manning. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MANNING, FRANCIS)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE GROUP INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
October 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE GROUP INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11446423), filed by AMERICAN SURGICAL ARTS, P.C., ATLANTIC NEUROSURGICAL SPECIALISTS P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [redacted], #2 Exhibit B [redacted], #3 Exhibit C [redacted], #4 Exhibit D redacted], #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ZEFUTIE, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATLANTIC NEUROSURGICAL SPECIALISTS P.A. et al v. UNITED HEALTHCARE GROUP INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OXFORD HEALTH PLANS LLC
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE GROUP INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLANTIC NEUROSURGICAL SPECIALISTS P.A.
Represented By: JOHN J. ZEFUTIE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN SURGICAL ARTS, P.C.
Represented By: JOHN J. ZEFUTIE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?