JUNE WEISS, D.M.D., PA v. HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. D/B/A THE HARTFORD et al
Plaintiff: JUNE WEISS, D.M.D., PA
Defendant: HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. D/B/A THE HARTFORD and SENTINEL INSURANCE CO., LTD.
Case Number: 2:2020cv14420
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 16 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Nationwide Class Action Claims . (POLLACK, JANINE)
December 1, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Nationwide Class Action Claims. Motion set for 1/4/2021 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
November 27, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Nationwide Class Action Claims by SENTINEL INSURANCE CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Sentinel's Motion to Dismiss Nationwide Class Action Claims, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHOENFELD, ALAN)
November 27, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SENTINEL INSURANCE CO., LTD. identifying Hartford Financial Services Group as Corporate Parent.. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
November 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN M. CHABOT on behalf of SENTINEL INSURANCE CO., LTD. (CHABOT, RYAN)
November 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by ALAN E. SCHOENFELD on behalf of SENTINEL INSURANCE CO., LTD. (SCHOENFELD, ALAN)
November 27, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by SENTINEL INSURANCE CO., LTD..(BROCHIN, JAMES)
November 27, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SENTINEL INSURANCE CO., LTD.. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
November 27, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION by HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. D/B/A THE HARTFORD, SENTINEL INSURANCE CO., LTD.. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES L. BROCHIN on behalf of HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. D/B/A THE HARTFORD, SENTINEL INSURANCE CO., LTD. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on December 22, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The Court will provide counsel with dial-in instructions. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 11/16/2020. (as, )
November 13, 2020 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. D/B/A THE HARTFORD has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/26/2020. (bt, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Answer to Complaint. Attorney JAMES L. BROCHIN for HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. D/B/A THE HARTFORD,JAMES L. BROCHIN for SENTINEL INSURANCE CO., LTD. added. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUNE WEISS, D.M.D., PA. SENTINEL INSURANCE CO., LTD. served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (POLLACK, JANINE)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUNE WEISS, D.M.D., PA. HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. D/B/A THE HARTFORD served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (POLLACK, JANINE)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. D/B/A THE HARTFORD, SENTINEL INSURANCE CO., LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JUNE WEISS, D.M.D., PA. (POLLACK, JANINE)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. D/B/A THE HARTFORD, SENTINEL INSURANCE CO., LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number BNJDC-11502290) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JUNE WEISS, D.M.D., PA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Part 1, #3 Exhibit A - Part 2, #4 Exhibit B - Part 1, #5 Exhibit B - Part 2, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Summons Hartford Financial Services Group d/b/a The Hartford, #13 Summons Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.)(POLLACK, JANINE)
October 14, 2020 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUNE WEISS, D.M.D., PA v. HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. D/B/A THE HARTFORD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. D/B/A THE HARTFORD
Represented By: JAMES L. BROCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SENTINEL INSURANCE CO., LTD.
Represented By: RYAN M. CHABOT
Represented By: ALAN E. SCHOENFELD
Represented By: JAMES L. BROCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUNE WEISS, D.M.D., PA
Represented By: JANINE L. POLLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?