AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY v. HOSE ASSEMBLIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant: WINZELER STAMPING CO., HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. doing business as GE APPLIANCES and HOSE ASSEMBLIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv14751
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Clerk's Office is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/17/2020. (sm)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 Letter re: Case Dismissal from Michael L. DeBona. (sm)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (qa, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee. (qa, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC., HOSE ASSEMBLIES, INC., WINZELER STAMPING CO. with JURY DEMAND, filed by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(qa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY v. HOSE ASSEMBLIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINZELER STAMPING CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. doing business as GE APPLIANCES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSE ASSEMBLIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL L. DEBONA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?