UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SHEMESH
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ERAN SHEMESH
Case Number: 2:2020cv16305
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. ERAN SHEMESH waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/13/2021. (YUREKLI, GOKCE)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ERAN SHEMESH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ERAN SHEMESH, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(YUREKLI, GOKCE)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SHEMESH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERAN SHEMESH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: GOKCE TUGCE YUREKLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?