DUDZINSKI et al v. WEIL-MCLAIN et al
Plaintiff: EWA DUDZINSKI, STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY and MAREK DUDZINSKI
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10 and ABC CORPS. 1-10
3Rd Party Plaintiff: WEIL-MCLAIN
3Rd Party Defendant: TACO, INC. and TRIANGLE TUBE/PHASE III CO. INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv17782
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk: Status/Settlement Conference via telephone held on 1/27/2021.(Court Reporter/None.) (LM, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: There shall be a telephone conference before the Undersigned on January 27, 2021 at 4:30 p.m. Participants will dial (1-888-684-8852) and the Access Code (1364268#) to join in on the conference call. If counsel are not available for the conference call or have any questions, please email chambers at mf_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 1/20/21.(LM, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TACO, INC., TRIANGLE TUBE/PHASE III CO. INC. Attached is the official court Summons as to Third-Party Defendants, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Summons to be Issued by WEIL-MCLAIN as to TRIANGLE TUBE/PHASE III CO. INC. and TACO, INC.. (FINEMAN, STEPHANIE)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Summons to be Issued by WEIL-MCLAIN as to TRIANGLE TUBE/PHASE III CO. INC. and TACO, INC.. (FINEMAN, STEPHANIE)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against TRIANGLE TUBE/PHASE III CO. INC. and TACO, INC., filed by WEIL-MCLAIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(FINEMAN, STEPHANIE)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by WEIL-MCLAIN.(FINEMAN, STEPHANIE)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION To Exempt Case From Compulsory Arbitration Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 201(e)(6) by WEIL-MCLAIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(FINEMAN, STEPHANIE)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by WEIL-MCLAIN NOTICE OF JOINT MOTION TO EXEMPT THIS CASE FROM COMPULSORY ARBITRATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FINEMAN, STEPHANIE)
December 7, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #6 Joint MOTION To Exempt Case From Compulsory Arbitration Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 201(e)(6) . Motion set for 1/4/2021 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER by WEIL-MCLAIN. (HAGGERTY, JOHN)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE BETH FINEMAN on behalf of WEIL-MCLAIN (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FINEMAN, STEPHANIE)
December 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (ak, )
December 2, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WEIL-MCLAIN identifying The Marley Company LLC as Corporate Parent.. (HAGGERTY, JOHN)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WEIL-MCLAIN from Superior Court of Union County, NJ, case number UNN-L-03540-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11749772), filed by WEIL-MCLAIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Farm Fire & Casualty Company DOI Profile, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Marley-Wylain DE SOS and the Marley-Wylain IN SOS, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - State Farm Summary of Loss, Financial Summary, and Payment Worksheet, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(HAGGERTY, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUDZINSKI et al v. WEIL-MCLAIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EWA DUDZINSKI
Represented By: PAUL R. DUFFY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: PAUL R. DUFFY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAREK DUDZINSKI
Represented By: PAUL R. DUFFY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: WEIL-MCLAIN
Represented By: JOHN JOSEPH HAGGERTY
Represented By: STEPHANIE BETH FINEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: TACO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: TRIANGLE TUBE/PHASE III CO. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?