TEXAS EASTERN TRANSMISSION, LP v. 11.549 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS, IN THE BOROUGH OF METUCHEN AND THE TOWNSHIP OF EDISON et al
Plaintiff: TEXAS EASTERN TRANSMISSION, LP
Defendant: PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, JANE AND JOHN DOES 1 THROUGH 50, ABC BUSINESS ENTITIES 1 THROUGH 50 and 11.549 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS, IN THE BOROUGH OF METUCHEN AND THE TOWNSHIP OF EDISON
Case Number: 2:2020cv18771
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Status telephone conference held on 1/8/2021. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY J. CORINO on behalf of PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY (CORINO, ANTHONY)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER:Scheduling a telephone conference for 1/8/2021 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel are to utilize the dial-in information previously provided by the court for the call. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12.21/2020. (ro, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Status telephone Conference held on 12/18/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling a telephone conference for 12/18/2020 at 11:00 a.m. The court will counsel with the dial in information for this call. Plaintiff's counsel shall provide Defense counsel withe the dial in instructions since they have not filed their appearance on the court docket. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/16/2020. (ro, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TEXAS EASTERN TRANSMISSION, LP. PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (LIPUMA, ANDREA)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 11.549 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS, IN THE BOROUGH OF METUCHEN AND THE TOWNSHIP OF EDISON, PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
December 14, 2020 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BLAINE R. FEINAUER on behalf of TEXAS EASTERN TRANSMISSION, LP (FEINAUER, BLAINE)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEXAS EASTERN TRANSMISSION, LP identifying Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC (GP) and Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC (LP) as Corporate Parent.. (LIPUMA, ANDREA)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC BUSINESS ENTITIES 1 THROUGH 50, JANE AND JOHN DOES 1 THROUGH 50, PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11803179), filed by TEXAS EASTERN TRANSMISSION, LP. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Notice of Condemnation, #3 Certification Declaration of Nancy Kist in Support of Brief, #4 Certification Declaration of Kimberly Chesler in Support of Brief, #5 Text of Proposed Order of Preliminary Injunction, #6 Text of Proposed Order of Taking, #7 Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIPUMA, ANDREA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TEXAS EASTERN TRANSMISSION, LP v. 11.549 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS, IN THE BOROUGH OF METUCHEN AND THE TOWNSHIP OF EDISON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY
Represented By: ANTHONY J. CORINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE AND JOHN DOES 1 THROUGH 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC BUSINESS ENTITIES 1 THROUGH 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 11.549 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS, IN THE BOROUGH OF METUCHEN AND THE TOWNSHIP OF EDISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEXAS EASTERN TRANSMISSION, LP
Represented By: BLAINE R. FEINAUER
Represented By: ANDREA A. LIPUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?