KAUL et al v. FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS et al
Plaintiff: Richard Arjun Kaul and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN
Defendant: ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, TD BANK N.A., ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS, RICHARD STANLEY, JOHN DOE #1-50, STEVEN LOMAZOW, LOUISIANA MEDICAL BOARD, GEICO INDEMNITY, JOHN BURDINE, Richard Crist, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PHYSICIANS, Jay Howard Solomon, NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP INC., LEWIS STEIN, DANIEL STOLZ, PETER STAATS, JOHN ROE 1-50, P.C. 1-50, SCOTT METZGER, PENNSYLVANIA MEDICAL BOARD, JOHN DIIORIO, GEICO, ERIC KANEFSKY, MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL BOARD, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS, HACKENSACK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, ROBERT GARRETT, Gregory Przybylski, BRIAN R. MARTINOTTI, Geico Casualty, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Robert Heary, CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD, FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS, CECELIA MOUTON, Lindy Washburn, CHRISTOPHER J CHRISTIE, DOREEN HAFNER, ANDREW KAUFMAN, ABC CORP 1-50 and MARC COHEN
Case Number: 2:2020cv18853
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 205 Letter from RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (Attachments: #1 Letter re Joint Discovery Plan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Envelope)(ams, )
January 25, 2021 Filing 204 Letter from RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (ams, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 203 Letter re Conference for Joint Discovery Plan from RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (ams, ) (Attachments: #1 Letter 2) (ams, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 201 Letter from RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (ams, )
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 LETTER ORDER that Defendants' #176 , #177 , #179 , #180 , #181 , #183 , #187 , #192 , #194 , #198 , requests to stay this matter are GRANTED; This matter is stayed pending further Order of the Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/14/2021. (ams, )
January 14, 2021 Filing 199 Letter from David J Montag. (MONTAG, DAVID)
January 13, 2021 Filing 198 Letter from Stewart M. Leviss re #183 Letter. (LEVISS, STEWART)
January 11, 2021 Filing 202 MOTION for Judicial Disqualification by ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, Richard Arjun Kaul. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Chief Judge Wolfson, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope)(ams, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 197 Letter from Thomas J. Cafferty. (CAFFERTY, THOMAS)
January 8, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #195 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Shulan for Defendant Congress of Neurological Surgeons. Motion set for 2/1/2021 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 196 Letter from Marc D. Haefner to the Hon. John M. Vazquez, U.S.D.J. regarding adjournment of time to answer. (HAEFNER, MARC)
January 7, 2021 Filing 195 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Shulan for Defendant Congress of Neurological Surgeons by CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David F. Herman, #2 Declaration of Jonathan Shulan, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(HERMAN, DAVID)
January 5, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #193 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM has been DENIED. Application was filed after the answer due date. (ams, )
January 5, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #191 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by TD BANK N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/18/2021. (ams, )
January 5, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #188 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/18/2021. (ams, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 194 Letter from Kenneth M. Brown seeking to join in collective requests of defendants for stay of proceedings. (BROWN, KENNETH)
January 5, 2021 Filing 193 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Atlantic Health Systems, Inc... (BROWN, KENNETH)
January 4, 2021 Filing 192 Letter from William T. Marshall, Jr. to Honorable John Michael Vazquez re TD Bank seeks to join in the collective requests of defendants in this matter which seek a stay of the proceedings re #158 Letter, #176 Letter. (MARSHALL, WILLIAM)
January 4, 2021 Filing 191 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to TD Bank, N.A.. Attorney WILLIAM T. MARSHALL, JR for TD BANK N.A. added. (MARSHALL, WILLIAM)
January 4, 2021 Filing 190 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TD BANK N.A. identifying TD Bank US Holding Company, TD Group US Holdings LLC and The Toronto-Dominion Bank, as Corporate Parent.. (MARSHALL, WILLIAM)
January 4, 2021 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. MARSHALL, JR on behalf of TD BANK N.A. (MARSHALL, WILLIAM)
January 4, 2021 Filing 188 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Congress of Neurological Surgeons.. (HERMAN, DAVID)
January 4, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #186 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PHYSICIANS, PETER STAATS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/18/2021. (ams, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 187 Letter from David J. Montag. (MONTAG, DAVID)
January 4, 2021 Filing 186 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Dr. Peter S. Staats and The American Society of Interventional Pain Physicians.. (MONTAG, DAVID)
January 4, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #184 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by DOREEN HAFNER, Gregory Przybylski, STEVEN LOMAZOW, Jay Howard Solomon, CHRISTOPHER J CHRISTIE, ANDREW KAUFMAN, ERIC KANEFSKY, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/18/2021. (ams, )
January 1, 2021 Filing 185 Letter from Robert J. McGuire, DAG re #176 Letter. (MCGUIRE, ROBERT)
January 1, 2021 Filing 184 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, Christopher J. Christie, Jay Howard Solomon, Steven Lomazow, Andrew Kaufman, Doreen Hafner, Gregory Przybylski, and Eric Kanefsky.. (MCGUIRE, ROBERT)
December 31, 2020 Filing 183 Letter from Thomas J. Cafferty, Esq.. (CAFFERTY, THOMAS)
December 31, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #182 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MARC COHEN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/18/2021. (ams, )
December 31, 2020 Filing 182 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Dr Marc Cohen.. (LEVISS, STEWART)
December 31, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #178 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, Richard Crist has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/18/2021. (ams, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 181 Letter from David F. Herman re #176 Letter. (HERMAN, DAVID)
December 30, 2020 Filing 180 Letter from Stewart M. Leviss re #176 Letter. (LEVISS, STEWART)
December 30, 2020 Filing 179 Letter from David J. D'Aloia. (D'ALOIA, DAVID)
December 30, 2020 Filing 178 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney DAVID D'ALOIA for ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY,DAVID D'ALOIA for Richard Crist added. (D'ALOIA, DAVID)
December 30, 2020 Filing 177 Letter from GEICO to the Hon. Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. re #176 Letter. (KANG, GENE)
December 29, 2020 Filing 176 Letter from Thomas J. Cafferty, Esq.. (CAFFERTY, THOMAS)
December 23, 2020 Filing 175 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM. (BROWN, KENNETH)
December 22, 2020 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC D. HAEFNER on behalf of ROBERT GARRETT, HACKENSACK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (HAEFNER, MARC)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 TEXT ORDER REALLOCATING AND REASSIGNING CASE. Case Number 1:20-cv-18853 reallocated to NEWARK. Case reassigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson for all further proceedings. Judge Noel L. Hillman, Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/22/2020. (mmb, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 172 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS. (HERMAN, DAVID)
December 21, 2020 Filing 171 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP INC. identifying Macromedia Incorporated as Corporate Parent.. (CAFFERTY, THOMAS)
December 21, 2020 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS JOSEPH CAFFERTY on behalf of NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP INC., Lindy Washburn (CAFFERTY, THOMAS)
December 21, 2020 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH M. BROWN on behalf of ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM (BROWN, KENNETH)
December 18, 2020 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER CLAYTON BANZHAF on behalf of ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, Richard Crist (BANZHAF, ALEXANDER)
December 18, 2020 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by GERI L. ALBIN on behalf of ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, Richard Crist (ALBIN, GERI)
December 18, 2020 Filing 166 Letter from David J.D'Aloia, Esq. to the the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson, U.S.D.J. re: Assignment of Case re #158 Letter. (D'ALOIA, DAVID)
December 18, 2020 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID D'ALOIA on behalf of ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, Richard Crist (D'ALOIA, DAVID)
December 18, 2020 Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. MONTAG on behalf of AMERICAN SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PHYSICIANS, PETER STAATS (MONTAG, DAVID)
December 18, 2020 Filing 163 Letter from Stewart M. Leviss, Esq. re #158 Letter. (LEVISS, STEWART)
December 17, 2020 Filing 162 Letter from Thomas J. Cafferty re #158 Letter. (CAFFERTY, THOMAS)
December 17, 2020 Filing 161 Letter from David F. Herman re #160 Letter, #158 Letter. (HERMAN, DAVID)
December 17, 2020 Filing 160 Letter from Robert J. McGuire, DAG re #158 Letter, #159 Letter. (MCGUIRE, ROBERT)
December 17, 2020 Filing 159 Letter from Robert J. McGuire, DAG re #158 Letter. (SOSINSKI, PETER)
December 17, 2020 Filing 158 Letter from Gene Y. Kang to the Hon. Freda L. Wolfson, U.S.D.J. re: Assignment of Case. (KANG, GENE)
December 16, 2020 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by GENE Y. KANG on behalf of GEICO, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY, Geico Casualty (KANG, GENE)
December 16, 2020 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by STEWART M. LEVISS on behalf of MARC COHEN (LEVISS, STEWART)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Order Initial Conference set for 1/26/2021 12:00 PM in Camden - Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 12/16/2020. (cry, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 154 Clerk's Letter: Attorneys are not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorneys' addresses. (dd, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID FOSTER HERMAN on behalf of CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS (HERMAN, DAVID)
December 14, 2020 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (mmb, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 152 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-03050. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 10, 2020 Filing 151 Case transferred, ONLY AS TO THE NEW JERSEY DEFENDANTS,to the USDC for the District of New Jersey, pursuant to the Court Order entered 11/30/2020. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd)
December 1, 2020 Filing 150 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: Defendant Richard Stanleys Motion to Dismiss #23 ; Defendant Mississippi Board of Medical Licensures Motion to Dismiss #68 ; Defendant Medical Board of Californias Motion to Dismiss #70 ; Defendant Medical Board of Californias Request for Judicial Notice #69 ; Defendants GEICO, GEICO Indemnity, GEICO General Insurance Co., GEICO Casualty, North Jersey Media Group Inc., Lindy Washburn, Dr. Peter Staats, the American Society of Interventional Pain Physicians, the New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, Christopher J. Christie, Dr. Andrew Kaufman, Doreen Hafner, Eric Kanefsky, Atlantic Health System, Dr. Robert F. Heary, Dr. Marc Cohen, John P. Di Iorio, TD Bank, NA, Congress of Neurological Surgeons, Howard Solomon, Gregory Przybylski, and Steven Lomazows Motion to Sever and Transfer #82 ; Defendants Hackensack University Medical Center and Robert Garretts Motion to Dismiss #112 ; Defendants Allstate Insurance Company and Richard Crists Motion to Sever and Transfer #47 ; and Defendant Robert F. Heary, M.D.s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #67 . Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/30/2020. (lcac)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER: GRANTING Richard Stanley's #23 Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Process and Insufficient Service of Process is GRANTED; GRANTING Mississippi Board of Medical Licensure's #68 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice; GRANTING Medical Board of California's #70 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice; DENYING as MOOT Defendant Medical Board of California's #69 Motion to Take Judicial Notice; GRANTING as to severance and transfer New Jersey Defendants' #82 Motion to Sever and Transfer Plaintiff Kaul's Claims Against New Jersey Defendants to the District of New Jersey, but DENYING without prejudice in all other respects; GRANTING as to transfer, severance, and joining the New Jersey Defendants Motion, but DENYING without prejudice in all other respects Hackensack University Medical Center and Robert Garrett's #112 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint; GRANTING as to severance and transfer, but in all other respects is DENYING without prejudice Allstate Insurance Company and Richard Crist's #47 Motion to Sever and Transfer, or in the Alternative to Dismiss; DENYING without prejudice Defendant Robert F. Heary, M.D.'s Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer this action as asserted against: GEICO, GEICO Indemnity, GEICO General Insurance Co., GEICO Casualty, Fourth Edition Inc. f/k/a North Jersey Media Group Inc. (sued herein as North Jersey Media Group, Inc.), Lindy Washburn, Dr. Peter Staats, the American Society of Interventional Pain Physicians, the New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, Christopher J. Christie, Dr. Andrew Kaufman, Doreen Hafner, Eric Kanefsky, Atlantic Health System, Dr. Robert F. Heary, Dr. Marc Cohen, John P. Di Iorio, TD Bank, NA; Congress of Neurological Surgeon, Howard Solomon, Gregory Przybylski, and Steven Lomazow; Allstate Insurance Company and Richard Crist; Hackensack University Medical Center and Robert Garrett. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order and the accompanying Memorandum Opinion to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 3278.. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/30/2020. (DJS)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion #147 for Default Judgment against Defendant JAY HOWARD SOLOMON is hereby DENIED. Plaintiffs allege that Defendant was "personally served." (ECF No. #147 at 5.) However, Plaintiffs' Certificate of Service (ECF No. #120 , ECF p. 21) indicates that service was made on Doreen Haffner at the "Office of the Attorney General," and that Solomon has been represented by the Office of the Attorney General in past legal proceedings. (Id.) Neither the certificate of service, nor Plaintiffs' motion establish that service of process complied with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(e). Moreover, Defendant Solomon has now entered a limited appearance in this case seeking to transfer this action. (See ECF No. #145 ; 9/23/20 Minute Order.) The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780.Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/23/2020. (DJS)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #145 Defendant STEVEN LOMAZOW, GREGORY PRZYBYLSKI, and JAY HOWARD SOLOMON's Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default (See ECF Nos. #122 #124 .) The court construes Defendants' motion as a request to join the "New Jersey" Defendants' motion to sever/transfer #82 and hereby orders that LOMAZOW, PRZYBYLSKI and SOLOMON's obligation to respond to the Complaint is hereby stayed pending resolution of the motion to sever/transfer. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/23/2020. (DJS)
September 22, 2020 Filing 148 REPLY to opposition to motion re #69 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope); ("Leave to file GRANTED. Response Timely Received on 3/13/2020" signed by Judge Tanya Chutkan on 9/22/2020.)(ztd)
September 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 2/10/2020. (tb)
September 17, 2020 Filing 147 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant JAY HOWARD SOLOMON filed by Plaintiff by RICHARD ARJUN KAUL (ztd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ztd). Modified on 9/23/2020 (DJS).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 FOX NEAL Order advising plaintiff to respond by 10/9/2020 to Defendant Daniel Stolz's Motion to Dismiss #132 133 or Court may deem matter as conceded and SHOW CAUSE why the court should not impose sanctions for failing to dismiss the claims against Stolz once Bankruptcy Judge Sherwood entered the permanent injunction order on February 10, 2020. Response limited to eight pages. (See order for further details). The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/17/2020. (DJS) Modified on 9/21/2020 (DJS).
September 1, 2020 Filing 145 MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,, 119 Summons Returned Executed,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,, #122 Clerk's Entry of Default, #120 Affidavit for Default, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,, #124 Clerk's Entry of Default, #47 MOTION to Sever and Transfer or Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Vacate Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,, #122 Clerk's Entry of Default, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,, #124 Clerk's Entry of Default, #47 MOTION to Sever and Transfer or Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Dismiss by STEVEN LOMAZOW, GREGORY PRZYBYLSKI, JAY HOWARD SOLOMON (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. McGuire, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McGuire, Robert)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice #144 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default as to STEVEN LOMAZOW. Plaintiffs attached no evidentiary support, nor did they provide citations to the record to establish service of process. (See Pls.' Mot. at 4.) The court has no obligation to scour the record in search of the evidentiary basis for Plaintiffs' motion, particularly here, where the Plaintiffs have sued close to 40 Defendants and the docket currently contains over 150 entries. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/28/2020. (DJS)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice #143 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default as to SCOTT METZGER. Plaintiffs attached no evidentiary support, nor did they provide citations to the record to establish service of process. (See Pls.' Mot. at 4.) The court has no obligation to scour the record in search of the evidentiary basis for Plaintiffs' motion, particularly here, where the Plaintiffs have sued close to 40 Defendants and the docket currently contains over 150 entries. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/28/2020. (DJS)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice #142 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default as to GREGORY PRZYBYLSKI. Plaintiffs attached no evidentiary support, nor did they provide citations to the record to establish service of process. (See Pls.' Mot. at 4.) The court has no obligation to scour the record in search of the evidentiary basis for Plaintiffs' motion, particularly here, where the Plaintiffs have sued close to 40 Defendants and the docket currently contains over 150 entries. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/28/2020. (DJS)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice #141 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default as to JAY HOWARD SOLOMON. Plaintiffs attached no evidentiary support, nor did they provide citations to the record to establish service of process. (See Pls.' Mot. at 2.) The court has no obligation to scour the record in search of the evidentiary basis for Plaintiffs' motion, particularly here, where the Plaintiffs have sued close to 40 Defendants and the docket currently contains over 150 entries. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/28/2020. (DJS)
August 24, 2020 Filing 144 MOTION for Default Judgment as to STEVEN LOMAZOW by RICHARD ARJUN KAUL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd)
August 24, 2020 Filing 143 MOTION for Default Judgment as to SCOTT METZGER by RICHARD ARJUN KAUL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd)
August 24, 2020 Filing 142 MOTION for Default Judgment as to GREGORY PRZYBYLSKI by RICHARD ARJUN KAUL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd)
August 24, 2020 Filing 141 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jay Howard Solomon by RICHARD ARJUN KAUL (ztd) (Main Document 141 replaced on 8/28/2020) (ztd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ztd). Modified on 8/28/2020 (ztd).
August 24, 2020 Filing 140 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Plaintiff's summons to Federation of State Medical Records This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/24/2020. ("Leave to file DENIED without prejudice. See ECF No. 127 Motion to Set Aside Default and Dismiss Complaint.) (ztd)
August 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 9/10/2020. (tb)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 FOX NEAL Order advising plaintiff to respond by 9/10/2020 to the Federation of Medical Boards' Motion #127 to Set Aside Default and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint or Court may treat matter as conceded. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/21/2020. (DJS) Modified on 8/24/2020 (DJS).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion #137 for Entry of Default as to Defendant Lewis Stein is hereby DENIED. The Certificate of Service attached to the motion indicates that the process server was informed Mr. Stein is deceased, but no executor of the estate was identified. Instead, the process server averred "I am sure his law firm is handling his estate or that they know how to." [sic] Additionally, the process server indicates service was made on an unidentified person at "Nusbaum, Stein, Goldstein, Bronstein & Kron." Neither the certification of service nor Plaintiffs' motion establish that service of process complied with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(e). The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780 Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/21/20. (DJS)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice Motion #138 for Extension of Time to File Response to #82 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Plaintiff Kaul's Claims Against New Jersey Defendants to the District of New Jersey. Plaintiffs' motion does not comply with Local Civil Rule 7(c), which requires that "[e]ach motion... shall be accompanied by a proposed order." Additionally, Plaintiffs' motion does not include a proposed due date for the response. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/21/2020. (DJS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 137 MOTION for Entry of Default for Lewis Stein by RICHARD ARJUN KAUL (ztd)
August 13, 2020 Filing 138 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #82 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Plaintiff Kaul's Claims Against New Jersey Defendants to the District of New Jersey by RICHARD ARJUN KAUL (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(ztd)
August 7, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #136 Supplemental Memorandum was entered in error at the direction of Chambers. (ztd)
August 7, 2020 Filing 136 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #132 Response to Document filed by DANIEL STOLZ. (ztd) Modified on 8/10/2020 (ztd).
August 5, 2020 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Stephen Lee Cate on behalf of FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS (Cate, Matthew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 134 REPLY in support of motion re #47 MOTION to Sever and Transfer or Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, RICHARD CRIST. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Winn Friddell, #2 Exhibit Kaul Letter to Attorney General Barr)(Friddell, Winn) Modified on 7/31/2020 (DJS).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby advised that supplemental motions or sur-replies will be stricken absent leave of court. The parties are further advised that given the number of issues raised in the Complaint, the number of Defendants in this case, the number of outstanding motions, as well as the time and resources required to manage this action, the court will view motions to supplement or motions to file sur-replies with EXTREME DISFAVOR and said motions will be denied absent EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/31/2020. (DJS)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Supplemental Memorandum #130 filed GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, and GEICO INDEMNITY is hereby STRICKEN for failure to seek leave of court. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/31/2020. (DJS)
July 31, 2020 Filing 130 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 07/31/2020.....SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #82 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Plaintiff Kaul's Claims Against New Jersey Defendants to the District of New Jersey Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Further Support of New Jersey Defendants' Motion to Sever and Transfer Plaintiff Kaul's Claims Against New Jersey Defendants to the District of New Jersey filed by GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY. (Kotula, Michael) Modified on 8/3/2020 (tb).
July 30, 2020 Filing 133 MOTION to Dismiss by DANIEL STOLZ (ztd);(See docket entry no. #132 to view.)
July 30, 2020 Filing 132 RESPONSE re #120 Affidavit for Default filed by DANIEL STOLZ. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ztd) Modified on 7/31/2020 (ztd).
July 30, 2020 Filing 129 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #128 Civil Statement re Certificate of Service from United States of America. (Van Horn, Daniel) Modified event title and link on 7/30/2020 (znmw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 128 Civil Statement Regarding Service of Process on Hon. Brian Martinotti from United States of America re BRIAN R. MARTINOTTI. (Van Horn, Daniel) Modified to add filer on 7/30/2020 (znmw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 127 MOTION to Set Aside Default by FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Fish in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Jay). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 7/30/2020 (znmw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 126 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests NONE by FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS (Brown, Jay)
July 29, 2020 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Ward Brown on behalf of FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS (Brown, Jay)
July 28, 2020 Filing 124 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JAY HOWARD SOLOMON (ztd)
July 28, 2020 Filing 123 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SCOTT METZGER (ztd)
July 28, 2020 Filing 122 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to STEVEN LOMAZOW, GREGORY PRZYBYLSKI (ztd)
July 28, 2020 Filing 121 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS, BRIAN R. MARTINOTTI (ztd) (Main Document 121 replaced on 7/28/2020) (ztd).
July 24, 2020 Filing 131 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to DANIEL STOLZ (ztd)
July 24, 2020 Filing 120 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (ztd)
July 24, 2020 Filing 119 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; STEVEN LOMAZOW served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020; BRIAN R. MARTINOTTI served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; SCOTT METZGER served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020; GREGORY PRZYBYLSKI served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020; JAY HOWARD SOLOMON served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020; DANIEL STOLZ served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019 (ztd) Modified on 7/28/2020 (ztd). (SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO.'S #120 TO VIEW.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 118 AFFIDAVIT by RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (ztd) (Main Document 118 replaced on 7/28/2020) (ztd).
July 16, 2020 Filing 117 Memorandum in opposition to ROBERT GARRETT and HACKENSACK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER #112 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztd); (7/16/20 received from Chambers for entry on the docket.) Modified on 7/17/2020 (DJS).
July 16, 2020 Filing 116 Memorandum in opposition to re ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY and RICHARD CRIST's #47 MOTION to Sever and Transfer or Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Dismiss filed by ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (ztd)(7/16/20 received from Chambers for entry on the docket.) Modified on 7/17/2020 (DJS).
July 15, 2020 Filing 115 REPLY to opposition to motion re #88 MOTION to Dismiss (Failure to Properly Serve) filed by JOHN BURDINE, LOUISIANA MEDICAL BOARD, CECELIA MOUTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 - Second Affidavit of Kieshan Williams, #2 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of John Michael Burdine, M.D.)(Evans, James)
July 8, 2020 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M Brown on behalf of ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM (Brown, Kenneth)
July 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 7/29/2020. (tb)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 FOX NEAL Order advising Plaintiffs to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #112 filed by Hackensack University Medical Center and Robert Garrett or Court may deem matter as conceded. Plaintiffs' response limited to 15 pages. Response due by 7/29/2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780 (see order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/7/2020. (DJS)
July 7, 2020 Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by ROBERT GARRETT, HACKENSACK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Steel, Laura)
July 7, 2020 Filing 110 MOTION to Compel by ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, RICHARD ARJUN KAUL (ztd); ("Leave to file GRANTED. MOTION DENIED" signed 7/7/2020 by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2020: #1 Exhibit) (ztd).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent #107 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Hackensack University Medical Center and Robert Garrett. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/6/2020. (DJS)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #108 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kenneth Michael Brown is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf Defendant Atlantic Health System, Inc. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/6/2020. (DJS)
July 6, 2020 Payment for #108 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenneth M. Brown, Fee Status: No Fee Paid.. ($100; Receipt number ADCDC-7302990). (Rillotta, Joseph)
July 1, 2020 Filing 111 Memorandum in opposition to re #88 MOTION to Dismiss (Failure to Properly Serve) filed by ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (ztd)
June 30, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia H. Wilton on behalf of JOHN BURDINE, LOUISIANA MEDICAL BOARD, CECELIA MOUTON (Wilton, Patricia)
June 30, 2020 Filing 108 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenneth M. Brown, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM (Rillotta, Joseph)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The court's 6/26/2020 Minute Order is hereby vacated due to clerical error. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/26/2020. (DJS)
June 26, 2020 Filing 107 Consent MOTION for Leave to File / (Re)File Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint by ROBERT GARRETT, HACKENSACK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Steel, Laura)
June 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2020. (tb)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 06/26/2020.....MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 8/10/2020. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/26/2020. (DJS) Modified on 6/26/2020 (tb). Modified on 6/29/2020 (tb).
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: Lifting Stay. Plaintiffs' response to the Motion #47 filed by Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company and Richard Crist due July 17, 2020 and shall be limited to 35 pages. Defendants' Reply due July 31, 2020 and shall be limited to 15 pages. Plaintiffs' single response to the motions to sever #79 #82 #83 #101 due July 17, 2020 and shall be limited to 25 pages. Defendants' reply, not to exceed ten pages, due July 31, 2020. Plaintiffs' response to the Motion to Dismiss filed by the Louisiana Medical Board, John Burdine, and Cecilia Mouton #88 due July 1, 2020 and shall not exceed 13 pages. Defendants' reply due July 15, 2020 and shall be limited to 7 pages. Briefing on the Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Heary #67 remains stayed until further order of this court. Defendant California Medical Board's Motion for Extension #98 denied as moot. See order for details. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/25/2020.(lcsd) Modified on 6/26/2020 (DJS).
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #105 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Joshua Counts Cumby and Don S. McKinney are hereby are withdrawn as counsel of record for the Louisiana State Board of Medical Examiners, Dr. Cecilia Mouton, and Dr. John Michael Burdine. James G. Evans shall remain as counsel of record for these defendants. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/19/2020. (DJS)
June 16, 2020 Filing 105 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JOHN BURDINE, LOUISIANA MEDICAL BOARD, CECELIA MOUTON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cumby, Joshua)
May 6, 2020 MINUTE ORDER: Granting #104 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Don S. McKinney is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendants Louisiana State Board of Medical Examiners (LSBME), Dr. Cecilia Mouton, and Dr. John Michael Burdine. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Jud ge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/6/2020. (DJS)
May 6, 2020 Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Don S. McKinney, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7095727. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN BURDINE, LOUISIANA MEDICAL BOARD, CECELIA MOUTON (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don S. McKinney, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cumby, Joshua)
May 6, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Counts Cumby on behalf of JOHN BURDINE, LOUISIANA MEDICAL BOARD, CECELIA MOUTON (Cumby, Joshua)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice #101 Motion to Dismiss BY ROBERT GARRETT and HACKENSACK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER. This action is STAYED pending further order of the court. See 03/20/2020 Minute Order. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/26/2020. (DJS)
March 26, 2020 Filing 102 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HACKENSACK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (Steel, Laura)
March 26, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by ROBERT GARRETT, HACKENSACK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Steel, Laura)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the current national emergency, the Standing Order issued by Chief Judge Howell on March 16, 2020 (available on the District Court's website), as well as the court's current staffing levels, this action is hereby STAYED (including all briefing deadlines) pending further order of the court. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order via email to: Richard Kaul drrichardkaul@gmail.com and Arnold Erwin Feldman docharley123@gmail.com. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/20/20. (DJS) Modified on 3/20/2020 (tb).
March 20, 2020 Filing 100 REPLY to opposition to motion re #69 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD. (Rhee, Christine)
March 20, 2020 Filing 99 REPLY to opposition to motion re #70 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD. (Rhee, Christine)
March 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's motion for leave to refile response due by 4/6/2020. (tb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McEwan, Ryan)
March 13, 2020 Filing 97 Memorandum in opposition to re #70 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN. (ztd)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs' Response #93 to Defendant Robert F. Heary's Motion to Dismiss #67 is hereby stricken. Pursuant to this court's 2/6/20 order #74 , Plaintiffs' response was due March 6, 2020 and was limited to nine pages. Plaintiffs' response, dated March 6, was received by the court on March 10, 2020. To the extent Plaintiffs intend to seek leave to refile the response, they shall file by April 6, 2020 a motion that sets forth the reason for the requested extension, the reasons why they did not move an extension before the deadline, as well as a response that complies with this court's prior order. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/13/2020. (DJS)
March 12, 2020 Filing 96 REPLY to opposition to motion re #68 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL BOARD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Woods, Mary)
March 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion seeking leave to refile response due by 3/25/2020. (tb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 95 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Allstate + Christ Motion #47 to Sever Transfer/Dismiss Complaint This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. See ECF No. #92 . Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/10/2020. (ztd) Modified on 3/13/2020 (DJS). Modified on 3/13/2020 (DJS).
March 10, 2020 Filing 93 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 3/13/2010.....Memorandum in opposition to re #67 Dr. Robert Heary's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztd) Modified on 3/13/2020 (DJS). Modified on 3/19/2020 (znmw).
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER finding as moot #90 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. DENYING LEAVE TO FILE Plaintiffs' Response to Allstate, et al Motion #47 to Sever. Plaintiffs may file a motion seeking leave to refile by March 25, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/10/2020. Modified on 3/16/2020 (DJS).
March 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 4/3/2020. (tb)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 FOX NEAL Order advising Plaintiffs to respond to #88 Motion to Dismiss filed by LOUISIANA MEDICAL BOARD, JOHN BURDINE, and CECELIA MOUTON, or Court may deem matter as conceded. Response due by 4/3/2020 and limited to 13 pages. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/9/2020. (DJS)
March 9, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, RICHARD CRIST (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friddell, Winn)
March 5, 2020 Filing 89 Memorandum in opposition to MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL BOARD'S MOTION #68 to Dismiss filed by ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(ztd) Modified on 3/9/2020 (DJS).
March 5, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss (Failure to Properly Serve) by JOHN BURDINE, LOUISIANA MEDICAL BOARD, CECELIA MOUTON (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 - August 15, 2016 LSBME decision, #4 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Dr. Cecilia Mouton, #5 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Kieshan Williams)(Evans, James); Modified text and deleted selected docketed entry information on 3/5/2020 (ztth). (ztth).
March 5, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by James Garrison Evans on behalf of JOHN BURDINE, LOUISIANA MEDICAL BOARD, CECELIA MOUTON (Evans, James)
February 28, 2020 Filing 94 SURREPLY to re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Process and Insufficient Service of Process filed by ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN. (ztd); ("Leave to File Granted" signed 2/28/2020 by Judge Tanya Chutkan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Waters on behalf of JOHN DIIORIO (Waters, Jason)
February 24, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Jo Woods on behalf of MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL BOARD (Woods, Mary)
February 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/2/2020. (tb)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order advising plaintiffs to respond to Motions to Sever #82 #83 or Court may deem matter as conceded. Responses due by 4/2/2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/29/2020. (DJS)
February 13, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Joinder by CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS re #82 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Plaintiff Kaul's Claims Against New Jersey Defendants to the District of New Jersey (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Points and Authorities, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shulan, Jonathan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Plaintiff Kaul's Claims Against New Jersey Defendants to the District of New Jersey by GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kotula, Michael) Modified on 2/14/2020 (ztd). Modified on 2/19/2020 (ztd).
February 10, 2020 Filing 81 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM (Rillotta, Joseph)
February 10, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph A. Rillotta (Rillotta, Joseph)
February 8, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As set forth in this court's 01/30/2020 MINUTE ORDER, the Federal Rules and the Court's Local Civil Rules do not require leave of court in order to file an omnibus motion. Likewise, a motion is not required for a defendant to join such a motion. Any defendant who joins the motion has satisfied its obligation to respond to the Complaint. The filing or joinder in on an omnibus motion shall not be deemed a waiver of any defenses, including but not limited to those relating to service of process and jurisdiction, that may be raised in any subsequent pleadings or dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/8/2020. (DJS)
February 8, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Denying TD Bank's motion #79 for failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(c), which requires that "[e]ach motion... shall be accompanied by a proposed order." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/8/2020. (DJS)
February 7, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION for Joinder /to join defendants in an omnibus motion to sever and transfer certain claims to the District of New Jersey (ECF 56) by TD BANK, NA (Ray, Robert)
February 7, 2020 Filing 78 REPLY to opposition to motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Process and Insufficient Service of Process filed by RICHARD STANLEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Klaffky, Stephen)
February 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses to dispositive motions due by 3/6/2020. Responses to motion to take judicial review due by 3/13/2020. (tb) Modified on 2/6/2020 (tb).
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 FOX NEAL ORDER: To the extent Plaintiffs wish to respond to the CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD's Motion to Take Judicial Notice #69 , Plaintiffs may due so by 3/13/20 or the court may treat the matter as conceded. Response limited to three pages. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/6/2020. (DJS)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 FOX NEAL ORDER: Order advising Plaintiffs to respond to the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD #70 or Court may deem matter as conceded. Response due by 3/13/2020 and limited to thirty-three pages. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780 Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/6/2020. (DJS)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AMENDED FOX NEAL ORDER: Amending #73 . Advising Plaintiffs to respond to the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL BOARD #68 or Court may deem matter as conceded. Response due by 3/6/2020 and limited to 10 pages. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: Plaintiff RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and Plaintiff ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780.. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/6/2020. (DJS)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AMENDED FOX NEAL ORDER: Amending #72 . Advising Plaintiffs to respond to the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant ROBERT HEARY #67 or Court may deem matter as conceded. Response due by 3/6/2020 and limited to 8 pages. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/6/2020. (DJS)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FOX NEAL ORDER: Order advising Plaintiffs to respond to the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL BOARD #68 or Court may deem matter as conceded. Response due by 3/6/2020 and limited to 10 pages. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: Plaintiff RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and Plaintiff ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/6/2020. (DJS)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FOX NEAL ORDER: Order advising Plaintiffs to respond to the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant ROBERT HEARY #67 or Court may deem matter as conceded. Response due by 3/6/2020 and limited to 8 pages. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: Plaintiff RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and Plaintiff ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/6/2020. (DJS) Modified on 2/6/2020 (DJS).
February 5, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Medical Board of California's Motion to Dismiss by CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD re #70 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Rhee, Christine)
February 5, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD (Rhee, Christine)
February 5, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss by CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rhee, Christine)
February 5, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss by MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL BOARD (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Service)(Skinner, Jeffrey)
February 5, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ROBERT HEARY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certification of Dr. Heary, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sponzilli, Edward)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Motion #66 to Stay Responsive Pleading Deadline and Participate in Briefing on the Forthcoming Omnibus Motion filed by Defendant CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS is hereby GRANTED. Defendant's obligation to answer is hereby STAYED pending further order of the court. The omnibus motion is due February 13, 2020. The filing of such a motion shall not be deemed a waiver of any defenses that may be raised in any subsequent pleadings or dispositive motions. Because Defendant has indicated that Plaintiffs objected to the relief requested in the current motion, CNS is hereby relieved of its obligation to confer with Plaintiffs pursuant to Rule 7(m) as it relates to the forthcoming omnibus motion. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/5/2020. (DJS)
February 5, 2020 Filing 66 Amended MOTION for Joinder (Motion to Stay Responsive Pleading Deadline and Participate in Briefing on the Forthcoming Omnibus Motion) by CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shulan, Jonathan). Added MOTION to Stay on 2/5/2020 (ztd).
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS' #65 Motion for Joinder for failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(c), which requires that "[e]ach motion... shall be accompanied by a proposed order." Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/5/2020. (DJS) Modified on 2/5/2020 (DJS).
February 4, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for Joinder (Motion to Stay Responsive Pleading Deadline and Participate in Briefing on the Forthcoming Omnibus Motion) by CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Shulan, Jonathan)
February 4, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY. Attorney Charles E. Leasure, III terminated. (Leasure, Charles)
February 4, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Anthony Kotula on behalf of GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY (Kotula, Michael)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying without prejudice 61 #30 Motion for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief; ORDER instructing Plaintiffs to direct communications with the court to the Clerk's office. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/31/2020. (Attachments: #1) (DJS)
January 31, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' omnibus motion is due February 13, 2020. (tb)
January 31, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Robert F. Heary, M.D. answer due by 2/5/2020. (tb)
January 30, 2020 Filing 60 RESPONSE re #23 Defendant Richard Stanley's MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Process and Insufficient Service of Process filed by ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd) Modified on 2/21/2020 (DJS).
January 30, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry I. Levy on behalf of GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY (Levy, Barry)
January 30, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D. Smith on behalf of GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY (Smith, Joshua)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Defendants AMERICAN SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PHYSICIANS, ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE, MARC COHEN, JOHN DIIORIO, GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY, DOREEN HAFNER, ROBERT HEARY, ERIC KANEFSKY, ANDREW KAUFMAN, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS, NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP, INC., PETER STAATS, and LINDY WASHBURN have filed a Motion #56 for Leave to File Omnibus Motion to sever and transfer certain claims. The Federal Rules and the Court's Local Civil Rules do not require leave of court in order to file an omnibus motion. Therefore, the Court hereby treats Defendants' motion as a request to stay the deadline to file their answers and, hereby, GRANTS the motion. The Defendants' obligation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby STAYED pending further order of the court. Defendants' omnibus motion is due February 13, 2020. The filing of such a motion shall not be deemed a waiver of any defenses, including but not limited to those relating to service of process and jurisdiction, that may be raised in any subsequent pleadings or dispositive motions. Because these Defendants have indicated that Plaintiffs objected to the relief requested in the current motion, the Defendants are hereby relieved of their obligation to confer with Plaintiffs pursuant to Rule 7(m) as it relates to the forthcoming omnibus motion. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: Plaintiff RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and Plaintiff ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/30/2020. (DJS)
January 29, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File AN OMNIBUS MOTION TO SEVER THE CLAIMS FILED BY RICHARD KAUL AGAINST NEW JERSEY DEFENDANTS AND TO TRANSFER THOSE CLAIMS TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY AND TO ENTER A SCHEDULING ORDER AND FOR A STAY by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PHYSICIANS, ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE, MARC COHEN, JOHN DIIORIO, GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY, DOREEN HAFNER, ROBERT HEARY, ERIC KANEFSKY, ANDREW KAUFMAN, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS, NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP, INC., PETER STAATS, LINDY WASHBURN (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Oks, Caroline)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #55 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Robert F. Heary, M.D. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by February 5, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: Plaintiff RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and Plaintiff ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/29/2020. (DJS)
January 29, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by ROBERT HEARY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sponzilli, Edward)
January 29, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward George Sponzilli on behalf of ROBERT HEARY (Sponzilli, Edward)
January 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/27/2020. Response to #47 due by 2/28/2020. (tb)
January 28, 2020 Filing 59 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RICHARD STANLEY served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/1/2020 (ztd)
January 28, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Klaffky on behalf of RICHARD STANLEY (Klaffky, Stephen)
January 28, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Kupperman on behalf of RICHARD STANLEY (Kupperman, Stephen)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order advising Plaintiffs to respond to the Motion filed by Defendants ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY and RICHARD CRIST #47 or Court may deem matter as conceded. Response due by 2/28/2020 and limited to 35 pages. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: Plaintiff RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and Plaintiff ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/28/2020. (DJS) Modified on 2/6/2020 (DJS).
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answer by Defendants ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY and RICHARD CRIST due 1/27/2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: Plaintiff RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and Plaintiff ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/28/2020. (DJS)
January 28, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Joseph Cafferty on behalf of NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP, INC., LINDY WASHBURN (Cafferty, Thomas)
January 28, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R Shulan on behalf of CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS (Shulan, Jonathan)
January 28, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Nomi Irene Lowy on behalf of NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP, INC., LINDY WASHBURN (Lowy, Nomi)
January 27, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Sever and Transfer or Dismiss by ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, RICHARD CRIST (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Friddell, Winn). Added MOTION to Transfer Case, MOTION to Dismiss on 1/28/2020 (ztd).
January 27, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, RICHARD CRIST (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friddell, Winn)
January 27, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, RICHARD CRIST. Case related to Case No. 16-2364; 2:18-cv-08086; 2:19-cv-13477; 2:19-cv-9232; 2:19-cv-8946. (Friddell, Winn)
January 27, 2020 Filing 44 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, RICHARD CRIST (Friddell, Winn)
January 27, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Winn C. Friddell on behalf of ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, RICHARD CRIST (Friddell, Winn)
January 27, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Rillotta on behalf of ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM (Rillotta, Joseph)
January 27, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin James Vernia on behalf of MARC COHEN (Vernia, Benjamin) (Main Document 41 replaced on 1/28/2020) (ztd).
January 25, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' AMERICAN SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PHYSICIANS and PETER STAATS shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 2/6/2020. (jth)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants AMERICAN SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PHYSICIANS and PETER STAATS shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by February 6, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: Plaintiff RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and Plaintiff ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/24/2020. (DJS) Modified on 1/27/2020 to reflect that this is a "Minute" paperless order (jth).
January 24, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PHYSICIANS, PETER STAATS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hassler, Laura)
January 24, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura M.K. Hassler on behalf of AMERICAN SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PHYSICIANS, PETER STAATS (Hassler, Laura)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: For purposes of Local Rule 7(m), all parties shall contact opposing counsel, or the opposing pro se Plaintiffs as appropriate, at least 24 hours prior to filing a non-dispositive motion. While other forms of communication may also be used, the movant shall at a minimum use email communication. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: Plaintiff RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and Plaintiff ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/23/2020. (DJS)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Robert F Heary, M.D.'s motions #19 #26 are hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the extent he seeks to extend the date by which he must answer the Complaint. The fact that Plaintiffs did not agree to extension requests made by other Defendants does not relieve Dr. Heary of his obligation to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(m). The motions are DENIED WITH PREJUDICE with respect to counsel's request that this court extend the answer due date for defendants who have not entered an appearance. The motion is further DENIED WITH PREJUDICE with respect to counsel's request that the court notify those non-appearing defendants of the court's ruling. To the extent counsel seeks relief on behalf of those defendants, he must formally enter an appearance. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: Plaintiff RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and Plaintiff ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/23/2020. (DJS)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #37 #38 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Thomas J. Cafferty and Nomi I. Lowy and are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendants NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP, INC. and LINDY WASHBURN. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions; granting #38 Motion for Leave to A ppear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on /23/2020. (DJS)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #35 #36 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Barry I. Levy and Joshua D. Smith and are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendants GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, and GEICO INDEMNITY. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions; granting [3 6] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/23/2020. (DJS)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jonathan Ryan Shulan is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf Defendant CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/23/2020. (DJS)
January 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant T.D. Bank, NA's answer due by 2/28/2020. Defendants Fourth Edition Inc. f/k/a North Jersey Media Group Inc. and Linda Washburn answer due by 2/5/2020. (tb)
January 17, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nomi I. Lowy, Esq., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6744854. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP, INC., LINDY WASHBURN (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nomi I. Lowy, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Oks, Caroline)
January 17, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas J. Cafferty, Esq., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6744769. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP, INC., LINDY WASHBURN (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas J. Cafferty, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Oks, Caroline)
January 16, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joshua D. Smith, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6739925. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Joshua D. Smith in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit 2, Proposed Order Admitting Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit 3, Certificate of Service)(Leasure, Charles)
January 16, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Barry I. Levy and Joshua D. Smith, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6739283. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Barry I. Levy in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit 2, Declaration of Joshua D. Smith Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order Admitting Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certificate of Service)(Leasure, Charles)
January 16, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Ryan Shulan, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6739399. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Ryan Shulan, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Scheff, Richard)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants Fourth Edition Inc. f/k/a North Jersey Media Group Inc. and Linda Washburn shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 2/5/2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/15/2020. (DJS)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINTE ORDER: Granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant T.D. Bank, NA shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 2/28/2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/15/20. (DJS)
January 15, 2020 MINUTE ORDER: Granting #24 #25 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Stephen H. Kupperman and Stephen Richard Klaffky are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant Richard Stanley. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions; granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice < font color=red
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failing to fully comply with Local Civil Rule 83.2(d)(4), which requires "a certification that the attorney [seeking admission] either HAS or HAS NOT BEEN DISCIPLINED by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/15/2020. (DJS)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Stan Ingram is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant Defendant Mississippi State Board of Medical Licensure. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/15/2020. (DJS)
January 9, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive Pleading by TD BANK, NA (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of service)(Ray, Robert)
January 9, 2020 Filing 32 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TD BANK, NA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of service)(Ray, Robert)
January 9, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Ray on behalf of TD BANK, NA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of service)(Ray, Robert)
January 6, 2020 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP, INC., LINDY WASHBURN re #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . (Oks, Caroline)
January 6, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP, INC., LINDY WASHBURN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oks, Caroline)
January 5, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS answer or otherwise response to the Complaint is due by 2/7/2020; Defendants' GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO INDEMNITY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S answer or otherwise response to the Complaint is due by 2/5/2020; Defendants' NEW JERSEY STATE BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS, CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE, DOREEN HAFNER, ERIC KANEFSKY, ANDREW KAUFMAN'S answer or otherwise response to the Complaint is due by 2/6/2020; (jth)
January 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order advising Plaintiffs to respond to the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Richard Stanley #23 or Court may deem matter as conceded. Response due by 1/31/2020 and limited to 10 pages. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/4/20. (DJS) Modified on 2/6/2020 (DJS).
January 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER finding as moot #21 Motion for Extension of Answer Due Date by Defendants GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY. See 1/4/2020 Minute Order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/4/20. (DJS)
January 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Motion #18 to Extend Answer Deadline. Defendants New Jersey State Board of Medical Examiners, Christopher J. Christie, Esq.; Doreen Hafner, Esq., Eric Kanefsky, Esq., and Andrew Kaufman, MD shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by February 6, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/4/20. (DJS)
January 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Motion #17 to Extend Answer Deadline. Defendants GEICO, GEICO Indemnity, GEICO General Insurance Company, and GEICO Casualty shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by February 5, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/4/20. (DJS)
January 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by February 7, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/4/20. (DJS)
January 3, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, MOTION Injunctive Relief by ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, RICHARD ARJUN KAUL (ztd); (See docket entry no. #30 to view.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 30 Memorandum in opposition to re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(ztd)
January 3, 2020 Filing 26 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ROBERT HEARY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sponzilli, Edward)
January 3, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen R. Klaffky, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6700841. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RICHARD STANLEY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Isenberg, Craig)
January 3, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen H. Kupperman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6700813. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RICHARD STANLEY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Isenberg, Craig)
January 3, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Process and Insufficient Service of Process by RICHARD STANLEY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Exh. A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Isenberg, Craig)
January 3, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Robert Isenberg on behalf of RICHARD STANLEY (Isenberg, Craig)
January 3, 2020 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Leasure, Charles)
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Leasure, III on behalf of GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY (Leasure, Charles)
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ROBERT HEARY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sponzilli, Edward)
January 3, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #17 Motion for Extension of Time to; emailed to michael.kotula@rivkin.com, cc'd 10 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel must contact Attorney Admissions at (202) 354-3153 regarding status. (ztd, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE, DOREEN HAFNER, ERIC KANEFSKY, ANDREW KAUFMAN, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(McGuire, Robert) Modified event on 1/3/2020 (ztd).
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by GEICO, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kotula, Michael)
January 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert McGuire on behalf of CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE, DOREEN HAFNER, ANDREW KAUFMAN, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS (McGuire, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 ERRATA by CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Ryan Shulan, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6690708. Fee Status: Fee Paid. filed by CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scheff, Richard)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Ryan Shulan, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6690708. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Ryan Shulan)(Scheff, Richard)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scheff, Richard)
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Scheff on behalf of CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS (Scheff, Richard)
December 31, 2019 Payment for #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stan Ingram, Fee Status: No Fee Paid.. ($100; Receipt number ADCDC-6690087). (Skinner, Jeffrey)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stan Ingram, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL BOARD (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Skinner, Jeffrey)
December 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Medical Board and Mississippi State Board of Medical Licensure answers due by 2/5/2020. (tb)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Motion #10 for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Mississippi State Board of Medical Licensure shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by February 5, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/27/19. (DJS)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Motion #9 for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Medical Board shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by February 5, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 2000 Cheney Highway, Suite 103, #273, Titusville, FL 32780. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/27/19. (DJS)
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL BOARD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Skinner, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McEwan, Ryan) Modified enventon 12/20/2019 (ztd).
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Rhee on behalf of CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD (Rhee, Christine)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan McEwan on behalf of CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD (McEwan, Ryan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN (ztd)
December 5, 2019 Summons (37) Issued as to ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PHYSICIANS, ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, JOHN BURDINE, CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD, CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE, MARC COHEN, CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS, RICHARD CRIST, JOHN DIIORIO, FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS, ROBERT GARRETT, GEICO CASUALTY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY, HACKENSACK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, DOREEN HAFNER, ROBERT HEARY, ERIC KANEFSKY, ANDREW KAUFMAN, STEVEN LOMAZOW, LOUISIANA MEDICAL BOARD, BRIAN R. MARTINOTTI, SCOTT METZGER, MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL BOARD, CECELIA MOUTON, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS, NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP, INC., PENNSYLVANIA MEDICAL BOARD, GREGORY PRZYBYLSKI, JAY HOWARD SOLOMON, PETER STAATS, RICHARD STANLEY, LEWIS STEIN, DANIEL STOLZ, TD BANK, NA, LINDY WASHBURN. (adh, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Order #3 returned as undeliverable to Arnold E. Feldman and no forwarding address indicated. (tb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Case reassignment notice filed on 10/16/19 was returned as undeliverable on 11/01/19 for Richard Kaul. (tb) Modified on 11/5/2019 (tb).
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiffs of their obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court, including rules regarding service of process. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to : RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, 440c Somerset Drive, Pearl River, NY 10965 and ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, 1860 Beach Boulevard, Biloxi, MS 39531. (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/29/19. (DJS)
October 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zrdj)
October 16, 2019 Filing fee received in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number: 4616101056. (zrdj)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, RICHARD ARJUN KAUL (zeg).
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN, RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(zeg). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/10/2020) (ztnr).
October 1, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/1/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zeg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAUL et al v. FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Arjun Kaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARNOLD ERWIN FELDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ALEXANDER CLAYTON BANZHAF
Represented By: DAVID D'ALOIA
Represented By: GERI L. ALBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD BANK N.A.
Represented By: WILLIAM T. MARSHALL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: KENNETH M. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS
Represented By: DAVID FOSTER HERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD STANLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN LOMAZOW
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUISIANA MEDICAL BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Represented By: MICHAEL A. KOTULA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BURDINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Crist
Represented By: ALEXANDER CLAYTON BANZHAF
Represented By: DAVID D'ALOIA
Represented By: GERI L. ALBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PHYSICIANS
Represented By: DAVID J. MONTAG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Howard Solomon
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP INC.
Represented By: NOMI IRENE LOWY
Represented By: THOMAS JOSEPH CAFFERTY
Represented By: Caroline E Oks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEWIS STEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL STOLZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER STAATS
Represented By: DAVID J. MONTAG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ROE 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.C. 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT METZGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA MEDICAL BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DIIORIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Represented By: MICHAEL A. KOTULA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC KANEFSKY
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HACKENSACK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: MARC D. HAEFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT GARRETT
Represented By: MARC D. HAEFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Przybylski
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN R. MARTINOTTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Represented By: MICHAEL A. KOTULA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Represented By: MICHAEL A. KOTULA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Heary
Represented By: Edward George Sponzilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CECELIA MOUTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindy Washburn
Represented By: NOMI IRENE LOWY
Represented By: THOMAS JOSEPH CAFFERTY
Represented By: Caroline E Oks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER J CHRISTIE
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOREEN HAFNER
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW KAUFMAN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARC COHEN
Represented By: STEWART M. LEVISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?