TORIBIO et al v. BARR et al
Plaintiff: LUIS TORIBIO, ENGLEWOOD INTERNATIONAL SERVICES, INC., TRM MULTISERVICE, LLC, CONCILIATION USA, INC. and LORUEL MULTI-SERVICE, LLC
Defendant: CHAD F WOLF, WILLIAM J. BARR, TIMOTHY J SHEA, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY and DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 2:2020cv19626
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 3114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WILLIAM J. BARR, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, TIMOTHY J SHEA, CHAD F WOLF. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #1 plaintiffs' request to be permitted to serve the rule 41(g) motion through ECF filings and email, etc; denying without prejudice #1 plaintiffs' request for a temporary restraining order and/or a preliminary injunction, etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 1/8/2021. (lag, )
December 18, 2020 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (ps)
December 18, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ephraim Savitt, #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Oscar A. Herasme. Motion set for 1/19/2021 before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson . Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, ) Modified on 12/18/2020 (bt, ).
December 18, 2020 Set deadlines as to #1 Motion for Return of Seized Property and Removal of Freeze on Bank Accounts ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number ANJDC-11837359.). Motion set for 1/19/2021 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, ) Modified on 12/18/2020 (bt, ).
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ephraim Savitt by CONCILIATION USA, INC., ENGLEWOOD INTERNATIONAL SERVICES, INC., LORUEL MULTI-SERVICE, LLC, LUIS TORIBIO, TRM MULTISERVICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of JTH, #2 Certification Certification of ES, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(HERBERT, JOHN)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Oscar A. Herasme by CONCILIATION USA, INC., ENGLEWOOD INTERNATIONAL SERVICES, INC., LORUEL MULTI-SERVICE, LLC, LUIS TORIBIO, TRM MULTISERVICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of JTH, #2 Certification Certification of OAH, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(HERBERT, JOHN)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRM MULTISERVICE, LLC. (HERBERT, JOHN)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LORUEL MULTI-SERVICE, LLC. (HERBERT, JOHN)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENGLEWOOD INTERNATIONAL SERVICES, INC.. (HERBERT, JOHN)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONCILIATION USA, INC.. (HERBERT, JOHN)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM J. BARR, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, TIMOTHY J SHEA, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CHAD F WOLF ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11837359), MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number ANJDC-11837359.), filed by ENGLEWOOD INTERNATIONAL SERVICES, INC., LORUEL MULTI-SERVICE, LLC, LUIS TORIBIO, TRM MULTISERVICE, LLC, CONCILIATION USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Affidavit Plaintiff's Affidavit, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Certificate of Service)(HERBERT, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TORIBIO et al v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS TORIBIO
Represented By: JOHN TRAVIS HERBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENGLEWOOD INTERNATIONAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JOHN TRAVIS HERBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRM MULTISERVICE, LLC
Represented By: JOHN TRAVIS HERBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONCILIATION USA, INC.
Represented By: JOHN TRAVIS HERBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORUEL MULTI-SERVICE, LLC
Represented By: JOHN TRAVIS HERBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM J. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY J SHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?