SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC. v. E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.
Defendant: CORTEVA, INC., E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC. (F/K/A DOWDUPONT, INC.), THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, DUPONT SPECIALTY PRODUCTS USA, LLC and THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv19906
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by CORTEVA, INC., DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC. (F/K/A DOWDUPONT, INC.), DUPONT SPECIALTY PRODUCTS USA, LLC, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit of Robin Erlenbaugh, #3 Affidavit of Calissa Brown, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(KURZWEIL, LANNY)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lindsey B. Mann; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/1/2021. (qa, )
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brooks Smith; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/1/2021. (qa, )
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Houston Shaner; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/1/2021. (qa, )
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher J. Kelleher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/1/2021. (qa, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to complaint through 2/12/2021, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/25/2021. (lag, )
January 15, 2021 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #18 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by DUPONT SPECIALTY PRODUCTS USA, LLC, DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC. (F/K/A DOWDUPONT, INC.), CORTEVA, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/25/2021. (bt, )
January 15, 2021 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #17 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/25/2021. (bt, )
January 15, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lindsey B. Mann, #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brooks Smith, #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Houston Shaner, #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher J. Kelleher. Motion set for 2/16/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
January 13, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lindsey B. Mann by SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsey B. Mann, #2 Declaration of Richard P. O'Leary, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(O'LEARY, RICHARD)
January 13, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brooks Smith by SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brooks Smith, #2 Declaration of Richard P. O'Leary, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(O'LEARY, RICHARD)
January 13, 2021 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC. (F/K/A DOWDUPONT, INC.). (KERNER, JUSTIN)
January 13, 2021 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DUPONT SPECIALTY PRODUCTS USA, LLC. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
January 13, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CORTEVA, INC.. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
January 13, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Time for Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC. (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
January 12, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL ERIC GORMAN on behalf of SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC. (GORMAN, DANIEL)
January 12, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNA CHRISTINE HUTCHINSON on behalf of SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC. (HUTCHINSON, JENNA)
January 12, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Houston Shaner by SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Houston Shaner, #2 Declaration of Richard P. O'Leary, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(O'LEARY, RICHARD)
January 12, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher J. Kelleher by SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Kelleher, #2 Declaration of Richard P. O'Leary, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(O'LEARY, RICHARD)
January 11, 2021 Filing 18 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants, DuPont de Nemours, Inc. (f/k/a DowDupont, Inc.), DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC, and Corteva, Inc.. Attorney DAVID A. HAWORTH,JUSTIN E. KERNER for CORTEVA, INC.,DAVID A. HAWORTH,JUSTIN E. KERNER for DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC. (F/K/A DOWDUPONT, INC.),DAVID A. HAWORTH,JUSTIN E. KERNER for DUPONT SPECIALTY PRODUCTS USA, LLC added. (HAWORTH, DAVID)
January 8, 2021 Filing 17 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company and The Chemours Company FC, LLC. Attorney LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL for E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY,LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL for THE CHEMOURS COMPANY,LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL for THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC added. (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
January 8, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by CONNOR ERIC PHALON on behalf of E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC (PHALON, CONNOR)
January 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN A. RICHMAN on behalf of E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC (RICHMAN, RYAN)
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIE SABRINA WATSON on behalf of E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC (WATSON, NATALIE)
January 8, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC identifying The Chemours Company as Corporate Parent.. (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CHEMOURS COMPANY. (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY identifying Corteva, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL on behalf of E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.. THE CHEMOURS COMPANY served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (O'LEARY, RICHARD)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.. THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (O'LEARY, RICHARD)
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.. CORTEVA, INC. served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (O'LEARY, RICHARD)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.. DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC. (F/K/A DOWDUPONT, INC.) served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (O'LEARY, RICHARD)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.. DUPONT SPECIALTY PRODUCTS USA, LLC served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (O'LEARY, RICHARD)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.. E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (O'LEARY, RICHARD)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CORTEVA, INC., DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC. (F/K/A DOWDUPONT, INC.), DUPONT SPECIALTY PRODUCTS USA, LLC, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
December 19, 2020 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC. identifying SUEZ Water Resources LLC as Corporate Parent.. (O'LEARY, RICHARD)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11848765) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'LEARY, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC. v. E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORTEVA, INC.
Represented By: DAVID A. HAWORTH
Represented By: JUSTIN E. KERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
Represented By: NATALIE SABRINA WATSON
Represented By: RYAN A. RICHMAN
Represented By: CONNOR ERIC PHALON
Represented By: LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC. (F/K/A DOWDUPONT, INC.)
Represented By: DAVID A. HAWORTH
Represented By: JUSTIN E. KERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHEMOURS COMPANY
Represented By: NATALIE SABRINA WATSON
Represented By: RYAN A. RICHMAN
Represented By: CONNOR ERIC PHALON
Represented By: LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUPONT SPECIALTY PRODUCTS USA, LLC
Represented By: DAVID A. HAWORTH
Represented By: JUSTIN E. KERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC
Represented By: NATALIE SABRINA WATSON
Represented By: RYAN A. RICHMAN
Represented By: CONNOR ERIC PHALON
Represented By: LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.
Represented By: RICHARD PATRICK O'LEARY
Represented By: JENNA CHRISTINE HUTCHINSON
Represented By: DANIEL ERIC GORMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?