GREENE v. THE MLB NETWORK, INC.
Plaintiff: MEREDITH GREENE
Defendant: THE MLB NETWORK, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00110
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MEREDITH GREENE. THE MLB NETWORK, INC. waiver sent on 1/13/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (BURDEN, JAMES)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE MLB NETWORK, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by MEREDITH GREENE as to THE MLB NETWORK, INC.. (BURDEN, JAMES)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by MEREDITH GREENE as to THE MLB NETWORK, INC.. (BURDEN, JAMES)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE MLB NETWORK, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11923867) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MEREDITH GREENE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BURDEN, JAMES)
January 5, 2021 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREENE v. THE MLB NETWORK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEREDITH GREENE
Represented By: JAMES EDWARD BURDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE MLB NETWORK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?