Dye v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Chavetta Dye
Defendant: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE DISTRIBUTING LLC, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC., ABBOTT LABORATORIES, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC, ASTRAZENECA LP, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, MERCK & CO., INC. doing business as Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, PFIZER, INC., The Procter & Gamble Distributing Co., TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A, INC. and THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY
In Re: PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00127
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by KERRY CARSON GREEN on behalf of THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE DISTRIBUTING LLC, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY (GREEN, KERRY)
January 5, 2021 Member Case Transferred in on 1/5/21 from the Northern District of Illinois 1:20-cv-0756 for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II) (gh, )
January 5, 2021 For all Case Management Orders #click here (gh, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
January 5, 2021 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (gh, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-07506. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 TRANSFERRED to the USDC New Jersey, Newark Division the electronic record. (nsf, )
January 4, 2021 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2789 Conditional Transfer Order filed 01/04/2021. (nsf, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to (USDC New Jersey, Newark Division)(nsf, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal to counsel of record. (lma, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 3/18/2021 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
December 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. F/K/A Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by Sherry Ann Knutson (Knutson, Sherry)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. F/K/A Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Hemmings, James)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. F/K/A Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by James R M Hemmings (Hemmings, James)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hemmings, James)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019-L-006042) filed by Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. F/K/A Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17757747. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hemmings, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dye v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE DISTRIBUTING LLC
Represented By: KERRY CARSON GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC.
Represented By: SHERRY A. KNUTSON
Represented By: JAMES R. M. HEMMINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC
Represented By: SHERRY A. KNUTSON
Represented By: JAMES R. M. HEMMINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
Represented By: SHERRY A. KNUTSON
Represented By: JAMES R. M. HEMMINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC. doing business as Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
Represented By: KERRY CARSON GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Distributing Co.
Represented By: KERRY CARSON GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC.
Represented By: SHERRY A. KNUTSON
Represented By: JAMES R. M. HEMMINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A, INC.
Represented By: SHERRY A. KNUTSON
Represented By: JAMES R. M. HEMMINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Represented By: KERRY CARSON GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chavetta Dye
Represented By: EPHRAIM SAMUEL GEISLER
Represented By: PAUL J. PENNOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?