UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. VEGA et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Hector Vega and Olga Vega
Case Number: 2:2021cv00303
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gokce T. Yurekli, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, Olga Vega SCRA, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, Hector Vega SCRA, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(YUREKLI, GOKCE)
February 18, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - D.E. #5 filed by Gokce Yurekli on 2/18/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion for Entry of Default. For future filings of this nature, please select the event "Request for Default" found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ams, )
February 18, 2021 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to OLGA VEGA, HECTOR VEGA for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ams, )
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. HECTOR VEGA served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (YUREKLI, GOKCE)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. OLGA VEGA served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (YUREKLI, GOKCE)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HECTOR VEGA, OLGA VEGA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Olga Vega Summons, #3 Summons Hector Vega Summons)(YUREKLI, GOKCE)
January 7, 2021 Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. VEGA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olga Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: GOKCE TUGCE YUREKLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?