Swanigan v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Swanigan
Defendant: ABBOTT LABORATORIES, MERCK & CO INC D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC, ASTRAZENECA LP, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, PFIZER, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A, INC. and THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY
In Re: PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00381
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Member Case Transferred in on 1/8/21 from the Northern District of Illinois 1:20-cv-07539, for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II) (gh, )
January 8, 2021 For all Case Management Orders #click here (gh, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
January 8, 2021 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (gh, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-07539. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 TRANSFERRED to the USDC District of New Jersey the electronic record (rp, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 2/17/2021 at 9:30 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 2/10/2021. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 6, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL (2789) Conditional Transfer Order filed 1/6/2021 (rp, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to USDC District of New Jersey (rp, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company (Coleman, Booker)
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company by Kerry Carson Green (Green, Kerry)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company (Coleman, Booker)
December 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company by Booker T Coleman, Jr (Coleman, Booker)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Coleman, Booker)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court, case number (2019 L 005973) filed by The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17759736. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A - Deeming Order and Amended Complaint, #2 EXHIBIT B - PART 1 - State Court Files, #3 EXHIBIT B - PART 2 - State Court Files, #4 EXHIBIT C - Transfer Order, #5 EXHIBIT D - Consent to Removal)(Coleman, Booker)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanigan v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO INC D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
Represented By: Booker T Coleman, Jr
Represented By: KERRY CARSON GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Represented By: Booker T Coleman, Jr
Represented By: KERRY CARSON GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Swanigan
Represented By: EPHRAIM SAMUEL GEISLER
Represented By: PAUL J. PENNOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?