FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC. v. LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. et al
Plaintiff: FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA, INC., LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. and FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC. A/S/O NORMAN FALK
Case Number: 2:2021cv01818
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by Noah Gradofsky on 3/31/21 cannot be processed until the application fee has been paid. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once payment has been recorded. This message is for informational purposes only. (jc, )
April 1, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The #10 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA, INC., LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC., has been DENIED. The request was required to be filed by the answer due date (3/3/2021). Even if the request had been filed by the answer due date, the Clerk only has the authority to extend the deadline by 14 days under Local Civil Rule 6.1. Defendants may submit a proposed order extending the deadline directly to the Court for consideration. (jc, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Richard A. Schuster to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GRADOFSKY, NOAH)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. and LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.. Attorney MATTHEW TOTO for LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA, INC.,MATTHEW TOTO for LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. added. (TOTO, MATTHEW)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard A. Schuster, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/22/2021. (ld, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on LG Electronics Alabama, Inc. on 2/10/21, filed by FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.. (GRADOFSKY, NOAH)
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. on 2/10/21, filed by FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.. (GRADOFSKY, NOAH)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 Exhibit to #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order by FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.. (GRADOFSKY, NOAH)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 Exhibit to #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.. (GRADOFSKY, NOAH)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA, INC., LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
February 4, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 3/1/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
February 4, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Jury Demand, Party Information. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jc, )
February 4, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification of Richard A. Schuster (ECF No. 3-1), submitted as an attachment to the #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Noah Gradofsky on 2/3/21, contains an improper signature. Only the filing user (Noah Gradofsky) is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SIGNATURE using the event Exhibit (to Document) and link back to the motion. Also, a Proposed Order was not submitted with the motion. PLEASE SUBMIT A PROPOSED ORDER using the event Exhibit (to Document) and link back to the motion. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jc, )
February 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
February 3, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC. A/S/O NORMAN FALK. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Richard A. Schuster)(GRADOFSKY, NOAH)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC. A/S/O NORMAN FALK. (GRADOFSKY, NOAH)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA, INC., LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12079422), filed by FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC. A/S/O NORMAN FALK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GRADOFSKY, NOAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC. v. LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW TOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW TOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC. A/S/O NORMAN FALK
Represented By: NOAH COLIN GRADOFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.
Represented By: NOAH COLIN GRADOFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?