U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - SAINT CLARE'S, LLC.
Plaintiff: U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Defendant: PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - SAINT CLARE'S, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02055
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - SAINT CLARE'S, LLC..(SAVAGE, ERIC)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 joint request to extend time for defendant to respond to complaint through 4/8/2021, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/25/2021. (lag, )
February 23, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the #6 joint letter request for an extension of time filed by ERIC SAVAGE on 2/22/2021 was submitted incorrectly as an application for a Clerk's order to extend time. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. For future filings of this nature please select the event "Letter" found in the Other Documents menu. This message is for informational purposes only. (lag, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint.. (SAVAGE, ERIC)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SANDRA T. JIMENEZ on behalf of PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - SAINT CLARE'S, LLC. (JIMENEZ, SANDRA)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - SAINT CLARE'S, LLC.. PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - SAINT CLARE'S, LLC. served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (SAVAGE, ERIC)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC A. SAVAGE on behalf of PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - SAINT CLARE'S, LLC. (SAVAGE, ERIC)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - SAINT CLARE'S, LLC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
February 8, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - SAINT CLARE'S, LLC. with JURY DEMAND, filed by U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BROWN, CAITLIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - SAINT CLARE'S, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Represented By: CAITLIN D. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - SAINT CLARE'S, LLC.
Represented By: SANDRA T. JIMENEZ
Represented By: ERIC A. SAVAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?