WILCOX v. PIMPINELLI
Plaintiff: RAHEEM WILCOX
Defendant: MIKE PIMPINELLI
Case Number: 2:2021cv02063
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from RAHEEM WILCOX. (ams, )
March 31, 2021 COMPLAINT against MIKE PIMPINELLI with JURY DEMAND, filed by RAHEEM WILCOX.(ams, )
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall REOPEN this matter; Plaintiff's #4 Second Application IFP is GRANTED; The Complaint shall be filed; SUMMONS SHALL NOT ISSUE at this time, as the Court has not yet completed its sua sponte screening, etc. (n/m). Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 3/31/2021. (ams, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by RAHEEM WILCOX. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ams, )
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff's Application IFP is denied without prejudice; This case is administratively terminated; Plaintiff may have this case reopened, if, within thirty (30) days of the date of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff either pre-pays the filing fee or submits a complete signed Application IFP, etc. (Form sent n/m). Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 2/16/2021. (ams, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 2/16/2021. (ams, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Application IFP, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(pnm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILCOX v. PIMPINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAHEEM WILCOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE PIMPINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?