WASHINGTON-HUDSON ASSOCIATES II, LLC v. TOWN SPORTS INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON-HUDSON ASSOCIATES II, LLC
Defendant: TOWN SPORTS INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02526
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Joseph A Dickson
2 Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1725
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (subject-matter jurisdiction) by TOWN SPORTS INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(D'ANGELO, MASSIMO)
April 12, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (subject-matter jurisdiction). Motion set for 5/17/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant's time to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's complaint is extended 30 days up to and including April 12, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 3/11/2021. (qa, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Town Sports International Holdings, Inc. on February 19, 2021, filed by WASHINGTON-HUDSON ASSOCIATES II, LLC. (PATELLA, RAYMOND)
March 9, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for an additional 30 days, up to and including April 12, 2021 (Attachment-Proposed Order). Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOWN SPORTS INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC.. (D'ANGELO, MASSIMO)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for an additional 30 days, up to and including April 12, 2021 (Attachment-Proposed Order) by TOWN SPORTS INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC.. (D'ANGELO, MASSIMO)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MASSIMO FABIO D'ANGELO on behalf of TOWN SPORTS INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC. (D'ANGELO, MASSIMO)
March 8, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #4 Notice of Appearance submitted by Massimo D'Angelo on 3/8/2021 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (qa, )
February 19, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to the case. (jbb)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TOWN SPORTS INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WASHINGTON-HUDSON ASSOCIATES II, LLC. (PATELLA, RAYMOND)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TOWN SPORTS INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12122979) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WASHINGTON-HUDSON ASSOCIATES II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E)(PATELLA, RAYMOND)
February 12, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WASHINGTON-HUDSON ASSOCIATES II, LLC v. TOWN SPORTS INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN SPORTS INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: MASSIMO FABIO D'ANGELO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON-HUDSON ASSOCIATES II, LLC
Represented By: RAYMOND M. PATELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?