AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC. v. FAIRFIELD HOTEL OPERATOR, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC.
Defendant: RICHARD SYZNANSKI, RICHARD ROES 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10, FAIRFIELD HOTEL OPERATOR, LLC, d/b/a DOUBLETREE BY HILTON and FAIRFIELD HOTEL OPERATOR, LLC doing business as DOUBLETREE BY HILTON
Case Number: 2:2021cv03286
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC.. FAIRFIELD HOTEL OPERATOR, LLC served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021; RICHARD SYZNANSKI served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. (FASSETT, DAVID)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FAIRFIELD HOTEL OPERATOR, LLC, RICHARD SYZNANSKI. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
February 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-10, FAIRFIELD HOTEL OPERATOR, LLC, d/b/a DOUBLETREE BY HILTON, RICHARD ROES 1-10, RICHARD SYZNANSKI ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12173721), filed by AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Fairfield Hotel Operator, LLC d/b/a Doubletree by Hilton, #3 Summons Richard Syznanski)(FASSETT, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC. v. FAIRFIELD HOTEL OPERATOR, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC.
Represented By: DAVID W. FASSETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD SYZNANSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ROES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIRFIELD HOTEL OPERATOR, LLC, d/b/a DOUBLETREE BY HILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIRFIELD HOTEL OPERATOR, LLC doing business as DOUBLETREE BY HILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?