FREIREICH v. GATEWAY ENERGY SERVICES CORPORATION
Plaintiff: JAY J. FREIREICH
Defendant: GATEWAY ENERGY SERVICES CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2021cv04525
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Defendant, Gateway Energy Services Corporation request for an extension to file an Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is granted. Answer shall be filed on or before June 11, 2021. So Ordered by Judge William J. Martini on 5/7/21. (gh, )
May 5, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Defendant re #5 Amended Complaint. (ROSENBLATT, MIRIAM)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER-The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's motion for the transfer of actions to the District of New Jersey (docket entry no. 8). The relief sought appears to be an application directed to an MDL proceeding in another jurisdiction. For this reason, the motion is denied. So Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 5/4/21. (Newman, Robin)
May 3, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to. Motion set for 5/17/2021 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by JAY J. FREIREICH re #6 Notice of Settlement (aty) Objection (MEYERS, GARY)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION of Plaintiff Jay Freireich for transfer of actions to the district of new jersey pursuant to 28 U.S. 1407 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial preceedings, filed by JAY J. FREIREICH (MEYERS, GARY) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 cover letter, #3 proof of service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(lag, )
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by GATEWAY ENERGY SERVICES CORPORATION (ROSENBLATT, MIRIAM)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against GATEWAY ENERGY SERVICES CORPORATION, filed by JAY J. FREIREICH.(MEYERS, GARY)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JAY J. FREIREICH, filed by JAY J. FREIREICH.(MEYERS, GARY)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAY J. FREIREICH. GATEWAY ENERGY SERVICES CORPORATION waiver sent on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (MEYERS, GARY)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GATEWAY ENERGY SERVICES CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jay J. Freireich ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12244707) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jay J. Freireich.(MEYERS, GARY)
March 9, 2021 Judge William J. Martini and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREIREICH v. GATEWAY ENERGY SERVICES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GATEWAY ENERGY SERVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: MIRIAM J ROSENBLATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY J. FREIREICH
Represented By: GARY MARTIN MEYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?