KASEM v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: AHMED KASEM and AHMED MAHMOUD SAID KASEM
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, MONTY WILKINSON, RANDI BORGEN, TRACY RENAUD, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS and UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2021cv04686
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMMONS & COMPLAINT served on 6 on 3/15/21, filed by AHMED MAHMOUD SAID KASEM. (LEWBEL, STEVEN)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AHMED MAHMOUD SAID KASEM. (Attachments: #1 Statement NOTICE OF MOTION, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF RANIA SHOUKIER, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION, #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF LOUIS G. ADOLFSEN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION, #4 Text of Proposed Order ORDER, #5 Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(LEWBEL, STEVEN)
March 18, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #4 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 4/19/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RANDI BORGEN, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, MONTY WILKINSON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by AHMED KASEM as to RANDI BORGEN, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, MONTY WILKINSON. (LEWBEL, STEVEN)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RANDI BORGEN, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, MONTY WILKINSON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12249781), filed by AHMED KASEM.(LEWBEL, STEVEN)
March 10, 2021 Judge Brian R. Martinotti added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KASEM v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMED KASEM
Represented By: STEVEN I. LEWBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMED MAHMOUD SAID KASEM
Represented By: STEVEN I. LEWBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONTY WILKINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDI BORGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY RENAUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?