GARDELLA v. CINTAS et al
Plaintiff: CHARLES T. GARDELLA
Defendant: XYZ PARTNERSHIP, JOHN DOE OR JANE DOE and ABC CORPORATION
3Rd Party Plaintiff: CINTAS
3Rd Party Defendant: ABCO REFRIGERATION SUPPLY CORP.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04793
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABCO REFRIGERATION SUPPLY CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
April 9, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - For future filings similar to D.E. #10 , please select the event "Summons - Request for Issue" found under Service of Process. This message is for informational purposes only. (ams, )
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 Joint Discovery Plan by CINTAS. (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan)(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Michael B. Devins, Esq.. (DEVINS, MICHAEL)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The telephonic initial scheduling conference set for April 14, 2021 is rescheduled to May 27, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/31/2021. (as, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ABCO REFRIGERATION SUPPLY CORP., filed by CINTAS.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CINTAS.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL B. DEVINS on behalf of CINTAS (DEVINS, MICHAEL)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE M. ROSA on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ROSA, JACQUELINE)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on April 14, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/15/2021. (as, )
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CINTAS from Bergen County Superior Court, case number BER-L-1066-21., filed by CINTAS.(BENNETT, JENNIFER)
March 12, 2021 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)
March 12, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ps)
March 12, 2021 Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number ANJDC-12253011. (ps)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CINTAS identifying Cintas Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (BENNETT, JENNIFER)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE by CINTAS NOTICE OF REMOVAL (BENNETT, JENNIFER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARDELLA v. CINTAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CINTAS
Represented By: JENNIFER MARIE BENNETT
Represented By: MICHAEL B. DEVINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES T. GARDELLA
Represented By: JACQUELINE M. ROSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE OR JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ABCO REFRIGERATION SUPPLY CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?