DUSKY v. BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Plaintiff: DUSKY BRIAN JAMES
Defendant: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv04981
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and III of Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 5/3/2021 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and III of Plaintiff's Complaint by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. Responses due by 4/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Helen E. Tuttle, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(TUTTLE, HELEN)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDRES F. PUERTA on behalf of BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC (PUERTA, ANDRES)
March 15, 2021 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/2/2021. (bt, )
March 12, 2021 Judge William J. Martini and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (ps)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to BMW of North America, LLC. Attorney HELEN E. TUTTLE for BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC added. (TUTTLE, HELEN)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp. as Corporate Parent.. (TUTTLE, HELEN)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC from SUPERIOR COURT OF BERGEN COUNTY, BER-L-000730-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12258947), filed by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(TUTTLE, HELEN) Modified on 4/12/2021 (dam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUSKY v. BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUSKY BRIAN JAMES
Represented By: JOHN TRAVIS HERBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: HELEN E. TUTTLE
Represented By: ANDRES F. PUERTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?