RYAN v. NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC
Plaintiff: JEFFREY ROBERT RYAN
Defendant: NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC
Case Number: 2:2021cv06127
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC.(THIRY, JOHN)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Per the parties' stipulation, (ECF No. 5), the deadline for Defendant New Jersey Transit Rail Operations, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is extended through and including 6/10/21. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/11/21. (tjd)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint extend time to file response by NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC. (THIRY, JOHN)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. THIRY on behalf of NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC (THIRY, JOHN)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on c. frank on 03/31/2021, filed by JEFFREY ROBERT RYAN. (MYERS, ROBERT)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12289739) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JEFFREY Robert RYAN.(MYERS, ROBERT)
March 22, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
March 22, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RYAN v. NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC
Represented By: JOHN A. THIRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY ROBERT RYAN
Represented By: ROBERT EARL MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?