LA QUINTA FRANCHISING, LLC v. S HOSPITALITY LLC et al
Plaintiff: LA QUINTA FRANCHISING, LLC
Defendant: S HOSPITALITY LLC and RAJESH PATEL
Case Number: 2:2021cv06195
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants S Hospitality LLC and Rajesh Patel for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (lag, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Default by LA QUINTA FRANCHISING, LLC against Defendants S Hospitality LLC and Rajesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Sager, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(SAGER, DAVID)
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LA QUINTA FRANCHISING, LLC. RAJESH PATEL served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. (SAGER, DAVID)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LA QUINTA FRANCHISING, LLC. S HOSPITALITY LLC served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. (SAGER, DAVID)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LA QUINTA FRANCHISING, LLC identifying Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SAGER, DAVID)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RAJESH PATEL, S HOSPITALITY LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RAJESH PATEL, S HOSPITALITY LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12291347), filed by LA QUINTA FRANCHISING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(SAGER, DAVID)
March 22, 2021 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LA QUINTA FRANCHISING, LLC v. S HOSPITALITY LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA QUINTA FRANCHISING, LLC
Represented By: DAVID S. SAGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S HOSPITALITY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAJESH PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?