AMAYA v. MAYORKAS et al
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Amaya
Defendant: TRACY RENAUD, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS and THE UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2021cv07664
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ENES HAJDARPASIC on behalf of ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, THE UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by WILFREDO AMAYA. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(FERNANDEZ, REGIS)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, THE UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
April 1, 2021 Judge John Michael Vazquez added. (ps)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12327223), filed by Wilfredo Amaya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FERNANDEZ, REGIS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMAYA v. MAYORKAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Amaya
Represented By: REGIS FERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY RENAUD
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?