1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST v. WINDSOR GARDENS CARE CENTER, INC.
Petitioner: 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST
Respondent: WINDSOR GARDENS CARE CENTER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv09170
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 27 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER: As per today's Telephone Status Conference, a Settlement Conference is scheduled for 6/18/21 at 2:00 p.m. by way of Zoom Videoconference. The Court will provide the parties with the connection information in advance. All parties with ACTUAL settlement authority are required to participate. The parties shall fax confidential settlement position papers of five (5) pages or less to Chambers (973-645-4549) on or before 6/15/21. On or before 6/8/21, counsel shall advise the Court if any party is unavailable for the 6/18/21 Settlement Conference and propose alternate dates for same. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/4/21. (jbb)
June 4, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/4/2021. (Court Reporter/Recorder: None) (jbb)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of counsel's unopposed request to change the start time of the Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 6/4/21 at 2:00 p.m. The request is GRANTED. The Telephone Status Conference on 6/4/21 will now begin at 3:15 p.m. The parties are instructed to dial 1-888-684-8852 and enter Access Code 9972150# at the time of the Conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/2/21. (jbb)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER: A Telephone Status Conference is scheduled for 6/4/21 at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall be prepared to discuss settlement and whether a Settlement Conference is appropriate. The parties are instructed to dial 1-888-684-8852 and enter Access Code 9972150# at the time of the Conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/28/21. (jbb)
May 21, 2021 Filing 32 Letter from Katherine H. Hansen re #31 Letter. (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
May 20, 2021 Filing 31 Letter from Jacqueline Voronov, Esq.. (VORONOV, JACQUELINE)
May 19, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST re #25 Cross MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Petitioner's Letter request to submit a Reply Brief in support of Petitioners cross-motion to enforce the arbitration award, Petitioner is granted until Wednesday, 5/19/2021 to submit its reply. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/12/2021. (bt, )
May 12, 2021 Filing 28 Letter from Jacqueline Voronov. (VORONOV, JACQUELINE)
May 11, 2021 Filing 27 Letter from Petitioner. (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
May 11, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WINDSOR GARDENS CARE CENTER, INC. re #14 Cross MOTION to Vacate Arbitration award (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Christopher Metternich, #2 Certification Supplemental Certification of Jeffrey Daitz, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A)(VORONOV, JACQUELINE)
May 6, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #25 Cross MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award . Motion set for 6/7/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 25 Cross MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 30, 2021 Filing 24 Transcript of Order to Show Cause held on April 26, 2021, before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Transcriber: Joanne Sekella (908-310-1177). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 5/21/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2021. (wh)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that Petitioner's request for a preliminary injunction is DENIED; The temporary restraints previously imposed by this Court are VACATED, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 4/26/2021. (ams, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan D. Wigenton: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/26/2021. (Court Reporter/Recorder JOANNE SEKELLA.) (cds)
April 22, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #14 Cross MOTION to Vacate Arbitration award . Motion set for 5/17/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
April 21, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST re #19 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #20 Declaration (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 21, 2021 Filing 20 DECLARATION re #19 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 21, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST re #14 Cross MOTION to Vacate Arbitration award (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Petitioner's Letter request for the deadline for filing reply papers be extended until 8 p.m. on 4/21/2021. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 4/21/2021. (bt, )
April 20, 2021 Filing 17 Letter from Katherine H. Hansen. (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 20, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY M. DAITZ on behalf of WINDSOR GARDENS CARE CENTER, INC. (DAITZ, JEFFREY)
April 19, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by WINDSOR GARDENS CARE CENTER, INC.. (VORONOV, JACQUELINE)
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 Cross MOTION to Vacate Arbitration award by WINDSOR GARDENS CARE CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Daitz, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Declaration Declaration of Chris Metternich, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #7 Brief Memorandum of Law)(VORONOV, JACQUELINE)
April 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM SAMUEL MASSEY on behalf of 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST (MASSEY, WILLIAM)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Respondent's Letter request for an extension until 8:00 p.m. on 4/19/2021 by which to submit Opposing papers. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 4/19/2021. (bt, ) Modified on 4/19/2021 (bt, ).
April 18, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Respondent's Counsel re #10 Order to Show Cause,, Temporary Restraining Order,. (VORONOV, JACQUELINE)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ***TEMPORARY RESTRAINTS VACATED pursuant to #23 Order*** ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: Show Cause Hearing set for 4/26/2021 01:00 PM via Zoom, ORDERED that any answering papers be filed and served no later than Monday, 4/19/2021 by 4:00 p.m., and that any reply papers be filed and served no later than Wednesday,4/21/2021 by 4:00 p.m. etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 4/15/2021. (bt, ) Modified on 4/28/2021 (ams, ).
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION re #5 Proposed Pretrial Order by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST. (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Order to Show Cause by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST. (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 Certification of KATHERINE H. HANSEN on behalf of 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST. (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Certification of KATHERINE H. HANSEN on behalf of 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST Re #1 Petition to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration Award. (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12368657.), filed by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification)(HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 14, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST v. WINDSOR GARDENS CARE CENTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST
Represented By: KATHERINE H. HANSEN
Represented By: WILLIAM SAMUEL MASSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WINDSOR GARDENS CARE CENTER, INC.
Represented By: JACQUELINE VORONOV
Represented By: JEFFREY M. DAITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?