RIVERA-ROMERO et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY RIVERA and FERGIE RIVERA-ROMERO
Defendant: WILLIAM CARLE, M.D., KEITH ZDZIRSKI, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JOHN DOE #1-10, HACKETTSTOWN MEDICAL CENTER, JULIA WALTER, ABC CORPORATION # 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, WILLIAM CARLE, JOHN DOES 1-10 and KEITH ZDZIARSKI
Case Number: 2:2021cv09218
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 Defendant United States of America's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, WILLIAM CARLE, HACKETTSTOWN MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN DOES 1-10, JULIA WALTER, KEITH ZDZIARSKI by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(JUNEAU, ANGELA)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER A. MARRA on behalf of HACKETTSTOWN MEDICAL CENTER (MARRA, PETER)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by TESS JENNIFER KLINE on behalf of WILLIAM CARLE (KLINE, TESS)
April 19, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption, Cause of Action, Party Information. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jc, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH PASCAL on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA from Superior Court of NJ, Morris County, case number MRS-L-425-20., filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Superior Court Docket Summary, #2 Exhibit B, Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit C, District Court Order of Dismissal, #4 Exhibit D, Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit E, Letter to Superior Court Clerk, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate of Service)(JUNEAU, ANGELA)
April 14, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIVERA-ROMERO et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM CARLE, M.D.
Represented By: SEAN P. BUCKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH ZDZIRSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ANGELA JUNEAU
Represented By: ELIZABETH PASCAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HACKETTSTOWN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: PETER A. MARRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIA WALTER
Represented By: PETER A. MARRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION # 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM CARLE
Represented By: SEAN P. BUCKLEY
Represented By: TESS JENNIFER KLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH ZDZIARSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY RIVERA
Represented By: ERNEST P. FRONZUTO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERGIE RIVERA-ROMERO
Represented By: ERNEST P. FRONZUTO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?