GRABOWSKI v. NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC.
Plaintiff: RICHARD GRABOWSKI
Defendant: NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv09224
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: James B Clark
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC..(HART, THOMAS)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Ron Sassi; Gurbir Grewel; on 04/23/21, filed by RICHARD GRABOWSKI. (MYERS, ROBERT)
June 9, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that as to #3 Affidavit of Service submitted by RICHARD GRABOWSKI on 6/9/2021 is not served properly pursuant to Federal Rule 4(c)(2) which states, any person who is at least 18 years old and not a party may serve the summons and complaint. Service by RRR mail is not proper service. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (JB, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12369959) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RICHARD GRABOWSKI.(MYERS, ROBERT)
April 14, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
April 14, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRABOWSKI v. NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC.
Represented By: THOMAS C. HART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD GRABOWSKI
Represented By: ROBERT EARL MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?