ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. SNAP TRANSLOADING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: NEW JERSEY RAIL CARRIER, LLC, SNAP TRANSLOADING, LLC and ALESSANDRA SOUZA COSTA
Case Number: 2:2021cv10392
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY. SNAP TRANSLOADING, LLC served on 6/12/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (SAMBURSKY, NEIL)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY. NEW JERSEY RAIL CARRIER, LLC served on 6/11/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (SAMBURSKY, NEIL)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALESSANDRA SOUZA COSTA, NEW JERSEY RAIL CARRIER, LLC, SNAP TRANSLOADING, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Letter from plaintiff, Admiral Insurance Company. (SAMBURSKY, NEIL)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY as to SNAP TRANSLOADING, LLC. (SAMBURSKY, NEIL)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY as to NEW JERSEY RAIL CARRIER, LLC. (SAMBURSKY, NEIL)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY identifying W.R. Berkley Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (SAMBURSKY, NEIL)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALESSANDRA SOUZA COSTA, NEW JERSEY RAIL CARRIER, LLC, SNAP TRANSLOADING, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12418486) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(SAMBURSKY, NEIL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. SNAP TRANSLOADING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: NEIL L. SAMBURSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY RAIL CARRIER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNAP TRANSLOADING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALESSANDRA SOUZA COSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?