MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC et al v. NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Plaintiff: MELINTA SUBSIDIARY CORP., REMPEX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC
Defendant: NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv11198
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(3) and to transfer venue. Motion set for 8/2/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(3) and to transfer venue by NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of James Richter with Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHTER, JAMES)
June 16, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/1/2021. (jc, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (RICHTER, JAMES)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. RICHTER on behalf of NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (RICHTER, JAMES)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC, REMPEX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MELINTA SUBSIDIARY CORP.. NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR on behalf of MELINTA SUBSIDIARY CORP., MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC, REMPEX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (WALSH, WILLIAM)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (jc, )
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
May 14, 2021 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MELINTA SUBSIDIARY CORP., MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC, REMPEX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12461448), filed by MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC, REMPEX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MELINTA SUBSIDIARY CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 AO120 Form)(WALSH, LIZA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC et al v. NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINTA SUBSIDIARY CORP.
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REMPEX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINTA THERAPEUTICS, LLC
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: JAMES S. RICHTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?