RIVAS FERNANDEZ v. BLUESOURCE, LLC
Plaintiff: EDUARDO RIVAS FERNANDEZ
Defendant: BLUESOURCE, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv11514
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in North Carolina Middle District as case 1:21-cv-00404, filed 05/21/2021. (km)
May 21, 2021 Case extracted via ECF to Middle District of North Carolina. (mfr)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Complaint in Hernandez-Adorno v. LMD & Assocs. (18cv17233 DE 343-1) shall be severed, assigned its own civil number, and venue transferred to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina; The Complaint in Rodriguez-Ortiz v. H.P. Services Corp. (18cv17233 DE 343-2) shall be severed, assigned its own civil number, and venue transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico; The Complaint in Ojeda v. Kallberg Industries, LLC (18cv17233 DE 343-3) shall be severed, assigned its own civil number, and venue transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida; The Complaint in Ojeda v. Kennett Consulting, LLC (18cv17233 DE 343-4) shall be severed, assigned its own civil number, and venue transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida; The Complaint in Rivas Fernandez v. Bluesource (18cv17233 DE 343-5) shall be severed, assigned its own civil number, and venue transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina; The Complaint in Gerena v. Able Innovations (18cv17233 DE 343-6) shall be severed, assigned its own civil number, and venue transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida; All claims not severed and transferred shall remain in this District, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/19/2021. (ams, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BLUESOURCE, LLC with JURY DEMAND, filed by EDUARDO RIVAS FERNANDEZ.(ams, )
May 19, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #2 Order. (ams, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIVAS FERNANDEZ v. BLUESOURCE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUESOURCE, LLC
Represented By: BARRY J. BERAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDUARDO RIVAS FERNANDEZ
Represented By: DANA M. CIMERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?