GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. DOUGLAS SPIEL, M.D., P.A. et al
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO., GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY and GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant: M.D. DOUGLAS SPIEL, M.D. FRANCIS PFLUM, M.D. RAJ RAVAL and DOUGLAS SPIEL, M.D., P.A.
Case Number: 2:2021cv11700
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by DOUGLAS SPIEL, M.D., P.A., FRANCIS PFLUM, DOUGLAS SPIEL.(ARIANS, E.)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to BARRY I. LEVY, MAX GERSHENOFF and JAMIE GREENWOOD etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/16/2021. (bt, )
July 14, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by DOUGLAS SPIEL, DOUGLAS SPIEL, M.D., P.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/20/2021. (bt, ) Modified on 7/14/2021 (bt, ).
July 14, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by FRANCIS PFLUM has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/26/2021. (bt, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, CONSENT ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER by DOUGLAS SPIEL, M.D., P.A., FRANCIS PFLUM, DOUGLAS SPIEL. (ARIANS, E.)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, CONSENT ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER by DOUGLAS SPIEL, M.D., P.A., FRANCIS PFLUM, DOUGLAS SPIEL. (ARIANS, E.)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Francis Pflum.. (ARIANS, E.)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Douglas Spiel, M.D., P.A., Douglas Spiel, M.D.. Attorney E. VICKI ARIANS for DOUGLAS SPIEL, M.D., P.A.,E. VICKI ARIANS for FRANCIS PFLUM,E. VICKI ARIANS for DOUGLAS SPIEL added. (ARIANS, E.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. FRANCIS PFLUM served on 6/20/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
June 21, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry I. Levy, Max Gershenoff and Jamie Greenwood. Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry I. Levy, Max Gershenoff and Jamie Greenwood by GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu Brief Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 7.1(d)(4), #2 Certification of Gene Y. Kang, #3 Certification of Barry I. Levy, #4 Certification of Max Gershenoff, #5 Certification of Jamie Greenwood, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. DOUGLAS SPIEL, M.D., P.A. served on 6/15/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DOUGLAS SPIEL, M.D., P.A., FRANCIS PFLUM, RAJ RAVAL, DOUGLAS SPIEL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KANG, GENE)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOUGLAS SPIEL, M.D., P.A., FRANCIS PFLUM, RAJ RAVAL, DOUGLAS SPIEL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12492105) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KANG, GENE)
May 25, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. DOUGLAS SPIEL, M.D., P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. DOUGLAS SPIEL
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. FRANCIS PFLUM
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. RAJ RAVAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS SPIEL, M.D., P.A.
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?