SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. SALZANO
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: THOMAS NICHOLAS SALZANO
Intervenor: United States
Case Number: 2:2021cv12189
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Andre M Espinosa
2 Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by THOMAS NICHOLAS SALZANO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(SELVERS, JEROME)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JEROME MITCHELL SELVERS on behalf of THOMAS NICHOLAS SALZANO (SELVERS, JEROME)
August 3, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Intervene and for a Stay. Motion set for 9/7/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene and for a Stay by United States. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(FAYER, JONATHAN)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge Madeline Cox Arleo no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/29/2021. (ams, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. THOMAS NICHOLAS SALZANO waiver sent on 6/11/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (GIZZI, PAUL)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to THOMAS NICHOLAS SALZANO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ALIX BIEL on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BIEL, ALIX)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL G. GIZZI on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (GIZZI, PAUL)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THOMAS NICHOLAS SALZANO with JURY DEMAND, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BEST, RICHARD)
June 7, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. SALZANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS NICHOLAS SALZANO
Represented By: JEROME MITCHELL SELVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: ALIX BIEL
Represented By: RICHARD R BEST
Represented By: PAUL G. GIZZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States
Represented By: JONATHAN C. FAYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?