DEEMUA v. TRINITAS HOSPITAL
Plaintiff: BLESSING DEEMUA
Defendant: TRINITAS HOSPITAL
Case Number: 2:2021cv12467
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/26/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/6/21. (jbb)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZA LYNN LLOYD on behalf of TRINITAS HOSPITAL (LLOYD, ELIZA)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by TRINITAS HOSPITAL.(SPEEDY, TIMOTHY)
June 15, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by TRINITAS HOSPITAL has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/2/2021. (ld, )
June 11, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (ak, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRINITAS HOSPITAL. (SPEEDY, TIMOTHY)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (SPEEDY, TIMOTHY)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TRINITAS HOSPITAL from Superior Court of Essex County, NJ, case number ESX-L-003792-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12541648), filed by TRINITAS HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Compliance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(SPEEDY, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEEMUA v. TRINITAS HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLESSING DEEMUA
Represented By: ELIZABETH TANDY FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRINITAS HOSPITAL
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. SPEEDY
Represented By: ELIZA LYNN LLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?