PICKETT et al v. INTELENET AMERICA LLC
Plaintiff: ANJELICA PICKETT, TAYLOR FETT and MINDY CHURCH
Defendant: INTELENET AMERICA, LLC doing business as Intelenet Global Services
Case Number: 2:2021cv12506
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; This action (Case No. 18-14052) is consolidated with the action Anjelica Pickett, Mindy Church, and Taylor Fett v. Intelenet America, LLC, Case No. 21-12506; A Final Approval Hearing will be held on 9/8/2021 at 2:00 PM, etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/21/2021. (ams, )
June 21, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #32 Order. (ams, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 31 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-04574. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 14, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #29 ) IS GRANTED. THIS ACTION SHALL BE TRANSFERRED FROM THE US DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA TO THE US DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NJ. EACH PARTY SHALL BEAR ITS OWN COSTS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 3/31/21.3/31/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Transfer filed by MINDY CHURCH, TAYLOR FETT, ANJELICA PICKETT.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BROWN, JASON)
August 11, 2020 REG ORDER ENTRY #28 ON 8/11/20. (jaa, )
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE UNTIL 10/28/20 TO COMPLETE PRE-CERTIFICATION DISCOVERY. DEFENDANT SHALL UNTIL 12/23/20 TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION AND COURT AUTHORIZED NOTICE TO POTENTIAL OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS PURSUANT TO 29 USC &216 (b); ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/12/20. 6/12/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL ) Modified on 6/17/2020 (lisad, ).
June 16, 2020 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines:( DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/28/2020.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Certify PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION AND COURT-AUTHORIZED NOTICE TO POTENTIAL OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 216(b).( RESPONSES DUE BY 12/23/2020.) (JL)
June 9, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #25 Order,, Set Deadlines, Enlargement of time to conduct pre-certification discovery and complete briefing of plaintiffs' motion for conditional certification by INTELENET AMERICA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ADMIRE, MEGAN) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 6/10/2020 (lisad, ).
May 15, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by INTELENET AMERICA LLC of Appearance of Megan M. Admire and Withdrawal of Appearance of Angela Hart-Edwards (ADMIRE, MEGAN)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE THEIR MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION ON OR BEFORE 2/13/2020. THE PARTIES HAVE UNTIL 6/11/2020 TO COMPLETE PRE-CERTIFICATION DISCOVERY. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 2/28/2020. 3/2/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
February 27, 2020 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER Pretrial Conference held on 2/26/20 (jaa, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 23 Discovery Plan by INTELENET AMERICA LLC.(HART-EDWARDS, ANGELA)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' #18 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ROD M. JOHNSTON, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 2/19/20.2/19/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 13, 2020 Filing 21 BRIEF in Support re #20 MOTION to Certify PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION AND COURT-AUTHORIZED NOTICE TO POTENTIAL OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by MINDY CHURCH, TAYLOR FETT, ANJELICA PICKETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Join Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit Consent to Join Form, #3 Exhibit Reminder Text Message, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Anjelica Pickett, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Taylor Fett, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Mindy Church, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Deasha Walker, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Keiera Gentry, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Michelle Singpradeth, #10 Exhibit Anjelica Pickett Paystubs, #11 Exhibit Taylor Fett Paystubs, #12 Exhibit Keiera Gentry Paystubs, #13 Exhibit DOL Fact Sheet #64)(BROWN, JASON) Modified on 2/14/2020 (lisad, ).
February 13, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Certify PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION AND COURT-AUTHORIZED NOTICE TO POTENTIAL OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by MINDY CHURCH, TAYLOR FETT, ANJELICA PICKETT.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BROWN, JASON)
February 6, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, together with and Affirmative Defenses to Collective and Class Action by INTELENET AMERICA LLC.(HART-EDWARDS, ANGELA)
February 3, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Rod M. Johnston ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14087316.) filed by MINDY CHURCH, TAYLOR FETT, ANJELICA PICKETT..(BROWN, JASON)
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/26/2020 03:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER.(adr)
January 27, 2020 Filing 16 (JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION, PRECERTIFICATION DISCOVERY, AND TOLLING OF THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS ) by MINDY CHURCH, TAYLOR FETT, ANJELICA PICKETT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CONLON, NICHOLAS) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 1/28/2020 (lisad, ).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT PARTIES' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS V, VI, & VII OF PLFF'S COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE IS GRANTED. COUNTS V, VI, & VII OF PLFFS; COMPLAINT ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, WITH EACH SIDE BEARING ITS OWN ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS; & DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS V, VI, & VII OF PLFF'S COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 11) IS GRANTED; & DEFT SHALL HAVE 30 DAYS TO FILE ITS ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 1/6/20.1/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT INTELENET AMERICA LLC'S MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ERICA GORDON AND SARAH LIS PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 1/6/20. 1/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Main Document 14 replaced on 1/10/2020) (ke, ).
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DISMISS COUNTS V, VI, AND VII OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by MINDY CHURCH, TAYLOR FETT, ANJELICA PICKETT.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CONLON, NICHOLAS)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Intelenet Global Services Private Limited, an Indian company headquartered in Mumbai, India. Additionally, Teleperformance SE, a French company publicly traded on the NYSE Euronext Market, acquired Intelenet Global Services Private Limited. Thus, a publicly held corporation indirectly owns 10% or more of the stock of Teleperformance Business Services US, LLC as Corporate Parent. with Certificate of Service by INTELENET AMERICA LLC.(HART-EDWARDS, ANGELA)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS V, VI, AND VII OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by INTELENET AMERICA LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HART-EDWARDS, ANGELA)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Sarah J. Lis, Esq. filed by INTELENET AMERICA LLC.Certificate of Service.(HART-EDWARDS, ANGELA) Modified on 12/10/2019 (rf, ). *FILING FEE PAID ON 12/10/19*
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Eric A. Gordon filed by INTELENET AMERICA LLC.Certificate of Service.(HART-EDWARDS, ANGELA) Modified on 12/10/2019 (rf, ). *FILING FEE PAID ON 12/10/19*
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' #6 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF NICHOLAS R. CONLON, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 12/5/19.12/9/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA D. HART-EDWARDS on behalf of INTELENET AMERICA LLC with Certficate of Service(HART-EDWARDS, ANGELA)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas R. Conlon ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13942473.) filed by MINDY CHURCH, TAYLOR FETT, ANJELICA PICKETT..(BROWN, JASON)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by MINDY CHURCH, TAYLOR FETT, ANJELICA PICKETT of Filing Consent to Join Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent to Join Forms)(BROWN, JASON)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANJELICA PICKETT, MINDY CHURCH, TAYLOR FETT. INTELENET AMERICA LLC waiver sent on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (BROWN, JASON)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by MINDY CHURCH, TAYLOR FETT, ANJELICA PICKETT of Filing Consent to Join Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent to Join Form)(BROWN, JASON)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by MINDY CHURCH, TAYLOR FETT, ANJELICA PICKETT of Filing Consent to Join Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent to Join Forms)(BROWN, JASON)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against INTELENET AMERICA LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE204639) filed by ANJELICA PICKETT, MINDY CHURCH and TAYLOR FETT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Coversheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track, #4 Ex 1, #5 Ex 2, #6 Ex 3, #7 Ex 4, #8 Ex 5, #9 Ex 6, #10 Ex 7, #11 Ex 8)(mbh, )
October 3, 2019 (1) Summons Issued as to INTELENET AMERICA LLC. Forwarded To: counsel on 10/3/19 (mbh, )
October 3, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PICKETT et al v. INTELENET AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANJELICA PICKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAYLOR FETT
Represented By: JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Represented By: NICHOLAS RAYMOND CONLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINDY CHURCH
Represented By: JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Represented By: NICHOLAS RAYMOND CONLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTELENET AMERICA, LLC doing business as Intelenet Global Services
Represented By: ANGELA D. HART-EDWARDS
Represented By: MEGAN M. ADMIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?