THERAPEUTICSMD, INC. v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: THERAPEUTICSMD, INC.
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. and TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2021cv12794
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter requesting an extension of time until 8/27/2021 to file Motions to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 8/10/2021. (ams, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from TherapeuticsMD to the Hon. Edward S. Kiel, U.S.M.J.. (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER. etc. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 7/27/2021. (ams, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Hon. Brian R. Martinotti. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 7, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Hon. Brian R. Martinotti, U.S.D.J.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal and Amendment to Caption)(WALSH, LIZA)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (WALSH, WILLIAM)
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THERAPEUTICSMD, INC.. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. waiver sent on 6/30/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (BATON, WILLIAM)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of THERAPEUTICSMD, INC. (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA on behalf of THERAPEUTICSMD, INC. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JB, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
June 22, 2021 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THERAPEUTICSMD, INC.. (BATON, WILLIAM)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12563420), filed by THERAPEUTICSMD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BATON, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THERAPEUTICSMD, INC. v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Represented By: WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Represented By: WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERAPEUTICSMD, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?