TRIS PHARMA, INC. v. ASCENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Plaintiff: TRIS PHARMA, INC.
Defendant: ASCENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv12867
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRIS PHARMA, INC.. ASCENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. waiver sent on 8/17/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (BETZ, CYNTHIA)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (ld, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASCENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (nic, )
June 24, 2021 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CYNTHIA STENCEL BETZ on behalf of TRIS PHARMA, INC. (BETZ, CYNTHIA)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRIS PHARMA, INC.. (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASCENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12568761), filed by TRIS PHARMA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(FLAHERTY, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRIS PHARMA, INC. v. ASCENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: CYNTHIA STENCEL BETZ
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?