MCCLAIRE v. COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: VANESHA MCCLAIRE and VENESHA MCCLAIRE
Defendant: DDR SOUTHEAST EAST HANOVER, L.L.C. a/k/a INLAND SOUTHEAST EAST HANOVER, L.L.C., JOHN DOES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS NAMES REPRESENTING UNKNOWN INDIVIDUALS) AND/OR XYZ CORPS. 1-10 (FICTITIOUS NAMES REPRESENTING UNKNOWN CORPORATIONS, PARTNERSHIPS AND/OR LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANIES OR OTHER, SITE CENTERS CORP., DDR SOUTHEAST EAST HANOVER, L.L.C and JOHN DOES 1-10
Cross Claimant: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION
Cross Defendant: XYZ CORP 1-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv12961
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER scheduling a Telephone Conference on 10/3/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 6/9/2023. (lag, )
June 7, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/7/2023. (sms)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER: The telephone status conference previously scheduled for June 7, 2023 (ECF No. #27 ) will commence at 10:30 a.m. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 6/6/2023. (sms)
May 25, 2023 Filing 28 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that a telephone status conference is scheduled for June 7, 2023 at 10:00a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel; Plaintiff shall serve her liability expert report by March 17, 2023; Defendant shall serve its responsive liability expert reports by April 28, 2023; depositions of all experts shall be completed by May 31, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/7/2023. (sm)
February 7, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/7/2023. (sms)
February 2, 2023 Filing 26 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that a telephone status conference is scheduled for 2/7/2023 at10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel; all affirmative expert reports shall be served by 1/30/2023; all responsive expert reports shall be served by 2/28/2023; depositions of all experts shall be completed by 3/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/18/2022. (sm)
October 18, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/18/2022. (sms)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER ORDER granting the parties' #23 Letter request for a 90-day extension of the fact discovery deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/16/2022. (mxw)
September 15, 2022 Filing 23 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint letter of August 15, 2022 [ECF No. #21 ], which sets forth a discovery dispute relating to defendant's demand for the production of information from plaintiff's Facebook page and Instagram account (collectively, Social Media Accounts). The Court finds that defendant's demand seeks relevant information, is proportional to the needs of the case, and is not overly burdensome. Plaintiff is directed to download the relevant contents of her Social Media Accounts for postings after September 18, 2020 (see ECF No. 1-1 para. 1) and to produce them in their native formats to defendant by September 12, 2022. For instance, instructions for downloading the contents of plaintiff's Facebook page are to be found at# Accessing & Downloading Your Information | Facebook Help Center . Plaintiff may mark the contents with the appropriate designations under the discovery confidentiality order (ECF No. #9 ). The parties are reminded of the telephone status conference set for October 18, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. and the deadline to complete all discovery by September 30, 2022 [ECF No. #20 .] So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/1/2022. (sms)
August 15, 2022 Filing 21 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that a Telephone Status Conference is scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel; all discovery shall be completed by 9/30/2022; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 7/8/2022. (sm)
July 8, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/8/2022. (sms)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: The telephone status conference previously set for July 6, 2022 (ECF No. 14) is adjourned to July 8, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 7/6/22.(bms)
July 5, 2022 Filing 18 Letter from LAWRENCE M. BERKELEY, ESQ.. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE)
June 27, 2022 Filing 17 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER ORDER that a status call is scheduled for 7/6/2022; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 6/9/2022. (sm)
June 7, 2022 Filing 15 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER scheduling a Telephone Status Conference on 7/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Fact Discovery due by 6/1/2022. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/8/2022. (bt)
March 8, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/8/2022. (sms)
February 24, 2022 Filing 13 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
December 15, 2021 Filing 12 Letter. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The parties having failed to file a joint letter as directed by the Court (ECF No. #10 para. 1), the telephone status conference scheduled for December 15, 2021 is adjourned to March 8, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties are directed to file a joint letter by December 21, 2021 explaining their failure to file the letter as directed by the Court. Additionally, the parties are directed to file a joint letter, at least three business days before the telephone status conference scheduled for March 8, 2022, advising of the status of discovery, any pending motions, and any other issues to be addressed. Fact discovery shall be completed by March 3, 2022. (See ECF No. 10 para. 3.) Counsel are reminded that a party or its attorney's failure to appear at a scheduling conference, failure to prepare substantially to participate in a conference, or failure to obey a scheduling or other pretrial order may result in the issuance of appropriate sanctions. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/14/2021. (sms)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER scheduling Telephone Conference on 12/15/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel; extending Fact Discovery through 3/3/2022, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/3/2021. (lag, )
September 3, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Initial scheduling conference held on 9/3/2021. (sms)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 8/24/2021. (sm)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Confidentiality Order)(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS, SITE CENTERS CORP., DDR SOUTHEAST EAST HANOVER, L.L.C. a/k/a INLAND SOUTHEAST EAST HANOVER, L.L.C.ORDER that all cross-claims are dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against any party. SITE CENTERS CORP., SITE CENTERS CORP., DDR SOUTHEAST EAST HANOVER, L.L.C (Inland Southeast East Hanover, L.L.C.) and DDR SOUTHEAST EAST HANOVER, L.L.C (Inland Southeast East Hanover, L.L.C.) terminated. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/24/2021. (sm)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by DDR SOUTHEAST EAST HANOVER, L.L.C, SITE CENTERS CORP.. (O'CONNELL, CHRISTOPHER)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on September 3, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 7/13/2021. (sms)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against DDR SOUTHEAST EAST HANOVER, L.L.C, JOHN DOES 1-10, SITE CENTERS CORP., XYZ CORP 1-10 by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION.(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12576314), filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE)
June 24, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ps)
June 24, 2021 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCLAIRE v. COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDR SOUTHEAST EAST HANOVER, L.L.C. a/k/a INLAND SOUTHEAST EAST HANOVER, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS NAMES REPRESENTING UNKNOWN INDIVIDUALS) AND/OR XYZ CORPS. 1-10 (FICTITIOUS NAMES REPRESENTING UNKNOWN CORPORATIONS, PARTNERSHIPS AND/OR LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANIES OR OTHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SITE CENTERS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDR SOUTHEAST EAST HANOVER, L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESHA MCCLAIRE
Represented By: ADAM B. LEDERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VENESHA MCCLAIRE
Represented By: ADAM B. LEDERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION
Represented By: LAWRENCE M. BERKELEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: XYZ CORP 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?