RICHARDSON v. CHETIRKIN et al
Petitioner: JEFFERY RICHARDSON
Respondent: ROBERT CHETIRKIN and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Case Number: 2:2021cv12993
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 Letter request from DAG to be removed from noticing.. (HENDERSON, CAROL)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that within forty-five (45) days of the date this Order is filed, Respondents may file a Motion to Dismiss the Petition; If a Motion to Dismiss is filed, Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days to file an opposition brief; If Petitioner files an opposition, Respondents shall have ten (10) days to file a reply brief. etc. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/11/2021. (ams, )
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge Kevin McNulty no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/30/2021. (jr)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number NEW044870.), filed by JEFFERY RICHARDSON. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Envelope)(ams, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHARDSON v. CHETIRKIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ROBERT CHETIRKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JEFFERY RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?