OLIVEROS v. COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP. et al
Plaintiff: MIRIAM OLIVEROS
Defendant: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP., ABC CORPORTATIONS 1-10 (said business entities being fictitious and unknown), COSTCO, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10 (said individuals being fictitious and unknown) and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Cross Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Arbitrator: DANIEL P. MCNERNEY
Case Number: 2:2021cv12996
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2023 ARBITRATION AWARD received and filed under seal. Maintained in electronic format on file in the Clerk's Office (NOTICE EMAILED TO PARTIES).(jjq, )
April 21, 2023 Filing 43 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney MICHAEL A. GALLARDO terminated. Attorney MICHAEL A. GALLARDO for MIRIAM OLIVEROS added.. (GALLARDO, MICHAEL)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order Appointing Arbitrator DANIEL P. MCNERNEY, Esq. Arbitration Hearing set for 5/25/2023 02:00 PM via Zoom.Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 4-11-23. (dmc)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Arbitration. The Clerk is directed to schedule this matter for arbitration at the next available date. A telephone conference is scheduled for 7/19/2023 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 4/6/2023. (qa, )
April 5, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/5/2023. (sms)
April 5, 2023 Filing 40 Letter from Michael A. Gallardo, Esq.. (GALLARDO, MICHAEL)
March 31, 2023 Filing 39 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that a telephone status conference is scheduled for April 5, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/9/2023. (qa, )
January 9, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/9/2023. (sms)
January 6, 2023 Filing 37 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying the #34 Motion for Reconsideration. The parties are reminded of the telephone status conference set for 1/9/2023 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/21/2022. (qa, )
December 5, 2022 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #34 MOTION for Reconsideration (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F)(GALLARDO, MICHAEL)
November 29, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #34 MOTION for Reconsideration . Motion set for 1/9/2023 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
November 23, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION for Reconsideration by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit, #4 Request for Oral Argument, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(MASTRANGELO, JASON)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER: Defendant's letter "request[ing] reconsideration of the Court's November 7, 2022 Order" (ECF No. #32 p.1) does not comply with Local Civil Rule 7.1(i) and will thus not be considered. Defendant is directed to file a formal motion for reconsideration by November 23, 2022, to which plaintiff may file an opposition by December 5, 2022. The motion for reconsideration shall be addressed at the January 9, 2023 telephone status conference (see ECF No. 18). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 11/16/22. (bms)
November 15, 2022 Filing 32 Letter re #31 Order,, Set Hearings,. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying the Requested Relief (ECF #27 , #28 ). Fact discovery is deemed complete. The parties are reminded of the telephone status conference scheduled for January 9, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 11/7/2022. (qa, )
October 31, 2022 Filing 30 Letter re #29 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 29 Letter re #28 Letter, #26 Letter, #27 Letter. (GALLARDO, MICHAEL)
October 28, 2022 Filing 28 Letter re #26 Letter, #27 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(GALLARDO, MICHAEL)
October 28, 2022 Filing 27 Letter re #26 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 26 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED TEXT ORDER: Defendant's request to compel certain discovery from plaintiff (ECF No. #21 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The parties' separate letters regarding defendant's request (ECF Nos. #21 , #22 , #23 ) will not be considered. As previously directed, the parties must confer and then raise discovery issues in a joint letter pursuant to the Courts preferences found #here. (See ECF No. 20 ). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/6/2022. (sms)
October 5, 2022 Filing 23 Letter from GALLARDO, MICHAEL re #22 Letter. (GALLARDO, MICHAEL)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's letter dated October 3, 2022 (ECF No. #21 ) will not be considered. As previously directed, the parties may raise issues as to defendants' supplemental discovery demand in a joint letter pursuant to the Court's preferences found #here by October 30, 2022. (See ECF No. 20 ). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/4/2022. (sms)
October 4, 2022 Filing 22 Letter re #21 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MASTRANGELO, JASON)
October 3, 2022 Filing 21 Letter from Gallardo, Michael. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(GALLARDO, MICHAEL)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' request for an extension of time to raise issues relating to their supplemental discovery demand (ECF No. #19 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall raise such issues in a joint letter pursuant to the Court's preferences found #here by October 30, 2022. Plaintiff is directed to respond to defendants' supplemental discovery demand by October 20, 2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/29/2022. (sms)
September 28, 2022 Filing 19 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is scheduled for January 9, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. Please mark your calendars accordingly. The parties shall file a joint letter, at least three days before the conference, advising of the status of discovery and any other issues to be addressed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/19/2022. (sms)
September 19, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/19/2022. (sms)
September 14, 2022 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT (Joint) in Advance of Status Conference by MIRIAM OLIVEROS. (GALLARDO, MICHAEL)
May 25, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/25/2022. (sms)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that a telephone status conference is scheduled for September 19, 2022 at 12:00 PM. The period for fact discovery is extended for a final time through September 30, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/25/2022. (qa, )
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The parties' request in their joint status letter dated May 18, 2022 (ECF No. #14 ) will be addressed at the telephone status conference scheduled for May 25, 2022 (see ECF No. 11). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/19/2022. (sms)
May 18, 2022 Filing 14 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
April 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a response to defendant's letter of April 8, 2022 (ECF No. 12) by April 14, 2022. Plaintiff is also directed to cooperate with defendant in completing fact discovery by May 21, 2022. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded that a party or its attorney's failure to appear at a scheduling conference, failure to prepare substantially to participate in a conference, or failure to obey a scheduling or other pretrial order may result in the issuance of appropriate sanctions. See Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(f). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 04/09/2022. (bms)
April 8, 2022 Filing 12 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is scheduled for May 25, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. Please mark your calendars accordingly. The parties shall file a joint letter, at least three days before the conference, advising of the status of discovery and any other issues to be addressed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/15/2022. (sms)
February 15, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/15/2022. (sms)
February 10, 2022 Filing 10 Letter. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 11/2/2021. (qa, )
October 28, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 10/28/2021. (sms)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Discovery Confidentiality Order, re #6 Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/28/2021. (qa, )
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the initial scheduling conference set for October 21, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. is rescheduled to October 28, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/18/2021. (sms)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Order by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP.. (MASTRANGELO, JASON)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 Joint Discovery Plan by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP..(MASTRANGELO, JASON)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on October 21, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 7/26/2021. (sms)
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10 by COSTCO, COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP..(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COSTCO, COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP.. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COSTCO, COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12579128), filed by COSTCO, COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE)
June 25, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ps)
June 25, 2021 Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLIVEROS v. COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP.
Represented By: LAWRENCE M. BERKELEY
Represented By: JASON JARED MASTRANGELO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORTATIONS 1-10 (said business entities being fictitious and unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COSTCO
Represented By: LAWRENCE M. BERKELEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10 (said individuals being fictitious and unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRIAM OLIVEROS
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALLARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Arbitrator: DANIEL P. MCNERNEY
Represented By: DANIEL P. MCNERNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?