TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC. et al v. APOTEX, INC.
Plaintiff: ARIAD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. and TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.
Defendant: APOTEX, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv12998
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Separate Defenses by APOTEX, INC..(ALBIN, GERI)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by GERI L. ALBIN on behalf of APOTEX, INC. (ALBIN, GERI)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD B. CALMANN on behalf of APOTEX, INC. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., ARIAD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.. APOTEX, INC. waiver sent on 7/8/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (JOHNSTON, RACHEL)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL SPEARS JOHNSTON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (JOHNSTON, RACHEL)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT C. BRADY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BRADY, ROBERT)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibit) (jc, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to APOTEX, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
June 28, 2021 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARIAD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APOTEX, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12579263), filed by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., ARIAD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC. et al v. APOTEX, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARIAD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Represented By: ROBERT C. BRADY
Represented By: RACHEL SPEARS JOHNSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Represented By: ROBERT C. BRADY
Represented By: RACHEL SPEARS JOHNSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Represented By: ROBERT C. BRADY
Represented By: RACHEL SPEARS JOHNSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX, INC.
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Represented By: GERI L. ALBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?