EDWARD HENRY v. FOX NEWS NETWORK, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Edward Henry
Defendant: SUZANNE SCOTT and FOX NEWS NETWORK, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2021cv13167
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 8/26/21. (gh, )
August 26, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (gh, )
August 26, 2021 Case extracted via ECF to the Southern District of New York. (gh, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 21 Letter from Michael B. Himmel to Hon. William J. Martini, U.S.D.J. re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York . (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation and Order to Transfer Venue)(HIMMEL, MICHAEL)
August 20, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee: Fee received as to Eugene Scalia, Avi Weitzman and Jesenka Mrdjenovic. $ 450, receipt number NEW045188 (pnm)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Plaintiff's Letter Request to withdraw his pending #5 pro hac vice motion, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 8/17/21. (jc, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 19 Letter from Brian M. Block re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ty Clevenger). (BLOCK, BRIAN)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Avi Weitzman, Esq. and Jesenka Mrdjenovic, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 8/11/2021. (ld, )
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eugene Scalia, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 8/11/2021. (ld, )
August 11, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 9/7/2021 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by FOX NEWS NETWORK, L.L.C., SUZANNE SCOTT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael B. Himmel, #2 Declaration of Eugene Scalia, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(HIMMEL, MICHAEL)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Plaintiff a one-week extension until August 16, 2021, to file its reply.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 8/6/2021. (ld, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Brian M. Block re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ty Clevenger). (BLOCK, BRIAN)
July 30, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Avi Weitzman and Jesenka Mrdjenovic, #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York . Motion set for 9/7/2021 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FOX NEWS NETWORK, L.L.C. identifying Fox Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (HIMMEL, MICHAEL)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by FOX NEWS NETWORK, L.L.C., SUZANNE SCOTT re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ty Clevenger) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jesenka Mrdjenovic, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Certificate of Service)(HIMMEL, MICHAEL)
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York by FOX NEWS NETWORK, L.L.C., SUZANNE SCOTT. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Denise Collins, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Denise Collins, #4 Declaration of Avi Weitzman, #5 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Avi Weitzman, #6 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Avi Weitzman, #7 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Avi Weitzman, #8 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Avi Weitzman, #9 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Avi Weitzman, #10 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Avi Weitzman, #11 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Avi Weitzman, #12 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Avi Weitzman, #13 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Avi Weitzman, #14 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Avi Weitzman, #15 Text of Proposed Order, #16 Certificate of Service)(HIMMEL, MICHAEL)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Avi Weitzman and Jesenka Mrdjenovic by FOX NEWS NETWORK, L.L.C., SUZANNE SCOTT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael B. Himmel, #2 Declaration of Avi Weitzman, #3 Declaration of Jesenka Mrdjenovic, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(HIMMEL, MICHAEL)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH ALDO FISCHETTI on behalf of FOX NEWS NETWORK, L.L.C., SUZANNE SCOTT (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL B. HIMMEL on behalf of FOX NEWS NETWORK, L.L.C., SUZANNE SCOTT (HIMMEL, MICHAEL)
July 21, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOEL G. MACMULL, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
July 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ty Clevenger). Motion set for 8/16/2021 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joel G. MacMull to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12643350.) (BLOCK, BRIAN)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ty Clevenger) by EDWARD HENRY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Block, #2 Declaration of Ty Clevenger, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BLOCK, BRIAN)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joel G. MacMull, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/16/2021. (ld, )
July 9, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joel G. MacMull, Esq.. Motion set for 8/2/2021 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joel G. MacMull, Esq. by EDWARD HENRY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel G. MacMull, #2 Declaration of Brian M. Block, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BLOCK, BRIAN)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT (Civil Cover Sheet) by EDWARD HENRY. (BLOCK, BRIAN)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FOX NEWS NETWORK, L.L.C., SUZANNE SCOTT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
June 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (ak, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FOX NEWS NETWORK, L.L.C., SUZANNE SCOTT ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12594677) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EDWARD HENRY.(BLOCK, BRIAN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EDWARD HENRY v. FOX NEWS NETWORK, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Henry
Represented By: BRIAN MATTHEW BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUZANNE SCOTT
Represented By: MICHAEL B. HIMMEL
Represented By: JOSEPH ALDO FISCHETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOX NEWS NETWORK, L.L.C.
Represented By: MICHAEL B. HIMMEL
Represented By: JOSEPH ALDO FISCHETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?