SIMNER v. LG ELECTRONICS USA INC
Plaintiff: RACHEL SIMNER
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS USA INC
Case Number: 2:2021cv13322
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 submitted by LG ELECTRONICS USA INC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/1/2021. (sm)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (YAMUSAH, MALLIK)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MALLIK NELSON YAMUSAH on behalf of LG ELECTRONICS USA INC (YAMUSAH, MALLIK)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LG ELECTRONICS USA INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
July 2, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LG ELECTRONICS USA INC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12602958) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RACHEL SIMNER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(CLOBES, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMNER v. LG ELECTRONICS USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS USA INC
Represented By: MALLIK NELSON YAMUSAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL SIMNER
Represented By: BRYAN L. CLOBES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?