NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY et al v. AGHAEI et al
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY
Defendant: YEMELY AGHAEI, ALI AGHAEI, AWILDA PIMENTAL, AURELINA BAUTISTA and LEOPOLDO JUAREZ
In Re: A.M.A. and A.L.A
Case Number: 2:2021cv14221
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Bergen County Justice Center10 Main StreetHackensack, NJ 07601 State No: FN-02-000091-21. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (sm)
August 25, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sm)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that this matter is REMANDED, and that the Clerk of Court shall transfer the file back to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Chancery Division: Family Part, Bergen County; that Defendant Ali A.s motion for child-pick up order (DE 9) is DENIED without prejudice, likewise for lack of jurisdiction; that the Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to Defendants, and to the Deputy Attorney General identified in the Family Court complaint, by regular mail. (DE 1-1 at 1.) Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/24/2021. (sm)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/24/2021. (sm) Modified on 8/30/2021 (sm).
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 EMERGENCY MOTION for Child Pick-Up Order by ALI AGHAEI. (Attachments: #1 Warrant to Return Physical Custody of Child(ren), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ams, )
August 23, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION. Motion set for 9/20/2021 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 Consent and Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by Ali Aghaei. (sm)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by Yemely Aghaej. (sm)
August 16, 2021 Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number NEW045160. (ps)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #5 IFP Application. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/13/2021. (Filing fee paid.)(nic, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by ALI AGHAEI. (sm)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 Clerk's Letter: Plaintiff's Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (wh)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (wh)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 Clerk's Letter: Notice of Removal not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (wh) Modified on 7/28/2021 (wh).
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Bergen County, case number FN-02-000091-21, filed by ALI AGHAEI. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit to Removal, #3 Child Protective Multipurpose Order, #4 Civil Protective Order, #5 Defendant's Answer to Complaint, #6 Order to Show Cause, #7 Defendants' Consent to Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(wh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY et al v. AGHAEI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: A.M.A. and A.L.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YEMELY AGHAEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALI AGHAEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AWILDA PIMENTAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURELINA BAUTISTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEOPOLDO JUAREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?