AGHAEI et al v. MECCA et al
Petitioner: AVIAN AGHAEI, A.A. and Y.A.
Respondent: JANE G. MECCA, VICTORIA GONCHAR and NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY
Case Number: 2:2021cv15407
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to AVIAN AGHAEI (ld, )
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to AVIAN AGHAEI (ld, )
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by AVIAN AGHAEI (ld, )
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Petitioner's habeas petition #1 #2 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Petitioner's request for injunctive relief is DENIED. Petitioner is DENIED a certificate of appealability. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order and the accompanying opinion upon Petitioner by regular mail and shall CLOSE the file. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/18/2021. (qa, )
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/18/2021. (qa, )
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number NEW045176 (mfr)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, by AVIAN AGHAEI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(bt, )NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, by AVIAN AGHAEI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(bt, )NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2021: #5 Exhibit 5) (bt, ).
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by AVIAN AGHAEI, ALI AGHAEI, YEMELY AGHAEI, ALIAH AGHAEI.(bt, )NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGHAEI et al v. MECCA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AVIAN AGHAEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: A.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Y.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JANE G. MECCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: VICTORIA GONCHAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?